Antonio Fernandez v. MLM Chino Property, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: Does 1-10, Big 5 Corp.,, MLM Chino Property, LLC and Big 5 Corp.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01263
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Notice of Settlement #13 . The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that the parties will file a Joint Stipulation for Dismissal within 60 days. The Court sets an Order to Show re: Settlement Hearing for October 22, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are advised the hearing will be vacated, and no appearance will be required provided a stipulation to dismiss, is filed by noon on October 20, 2020. (mrgo)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 proof of service)(Seabock, Amanda)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #11 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants MLM CHINO PROPERTIES, LLC and BIG 5 CORP., shall have until August 28, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (mrgo)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 28, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Big 5 Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Shireen Banki Rogers added to party Big 5 Corp. (pty:dft))(Rogers, Shireen)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant MLM Chino Property, LLC served on 7/1/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: C T Corporation System (Daisy Montenegro, intake specialist) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (mrgo)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Big 5 Corp. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Shireen Rogers, Attorney. (Handy, Russell)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Big 5 Corp., MLM Chino Property, LLC. (ghap)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Handy, Russell)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26933432 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Fernandez v. MLM Chino Property, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big 5 Corp.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLM Chino Property, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big 5 Corp.
Represented By: Shireen Banki Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?