United States of America v. 537.48 Acres of Land, more or less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: John Jason Chun, County of San Bernardino, N.R.L.L. East, LLC, Farmers and Merchant Bank, 537.48 Acres of Land, more or less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California, Aukland Pastures LLC and 537.48 Acres of Land
Case Number: 5:2020cv01353
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. ยง 946
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of service by publication filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit results, Florida Division of Corporations, #2 Exhibit notice of condemnation to be published)(Baker, Melissa)
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for delivery of possession filed by plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of C. Proudfoot, #3 Proposed Order) (Baker, Melissa)
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff United States of America. upon Aukland Pastures LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/7/2006, answer due 9/5/2006. Waiver of Service signed by Kai MacDonald, Esq.. (Baker, Melissa)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant John Jason Chun, (Cummings, Charles)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #14 JURY DEMAND. Answerto Amended Complaint filed by Defendant John Jason Chun.(Cummings, Charles)
August 15, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff United States of America. upon John Jason Chun waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Charles D. Cummings. (Baker, Melissa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule G, amended)(Baker, Melissa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Amended Complaint and Declaration of Taking filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baker, Melissa)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received 161,200.00 into the registry of the Court from United States of America on 08/10/2020. Re: Order on Motion to Deposit Funds #9 . Receipt number LA209712. (pri)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLAIMER filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (Norton, Mitchell)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff United States of America. upon Farmers and Merchant Bank waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Kara Smith. (Baker, Melissa)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #8 APPLICATION to Deposit Funds. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Deposit Funds filed by plaintiff United States of America. Application set for hearing on 8/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Baker, Melissa)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Baker, Melissa)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Baker, Melissa)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of James B. Balocki DECLARATION OF TAKING filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Baker, Melissa)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taking) (Attorney Melissa Baker added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Baker, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 537.48 Acres of Land, more or less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jason Chun
Represented By: D Daniel Pranata
Represented By: Karyn A. M. Jakubowski
Represented By: Charles David Cummings
Represented By: Gary A Kovacic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Bernardino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.R.L.L. East, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers and Merchant Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 537.48 Acres of Land, more or less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aukland Pastures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 537.48 Acres of Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa Baker
Represented By: Devin Andrew Wolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?