Steven V. Mendoza v. Winco Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven V. Mendoza
Defendant: Winco Holdings, Inc., Winco Foods, Inc., Ernie Last Name Unknown, Brian Last Name Unknown, First Name Unknown McKenzie and DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv01371
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Steven V. Mendoza, upon Defendant Ernie Last Name Unknown served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ruben Ortega, Supervisor at Winco Foods in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Rothman, Jay)
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Steven V. Mendoza, upon Defendant Brian Last Name Unknown served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ruben Ortega, Supervisor at Winco Foods in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Rothman, Jay)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Steven V. Mendoza, upon Defendant First Name Unknown McKenzie served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ruben Ortega, Supervisor at Winco Foods in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Rothman, Jay)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued complaint #1 as to defendant Ernie Last Name Unknown. (twdb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re complaint #1 as to defendant First Name Unknown McKenzie. (twdb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Brian Last Name Unknown. (twdb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Plaintiff Steven V. Mendoza. (Rothman, Jay)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Plaintiff Steven V. Mendoza. (Rothman, Jay)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Plaintiff Steven V. Mendoza. (Rothman, Jay)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth and Judge John F. Walter to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-01371 JGB (KKx). (jtil)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 [SEE CLERICAL ERROR RE NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT, Docket Entry No. 10] to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) Modified on 7/13/2020 (jtil).
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Winco Holdings, Inc., served on 07/13/20. (Truxler, Christopher)
July 9, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Winco Foods, Inc., attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
July 9, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Steven V. Mendoza in San Bernardino Superior Court on 5/29/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Winco Holdings, Inc.. (Truxler, Christopher)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Winco Holdings, Inc., (Truxler, Christopher)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Isabelle Yanz re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Winco Holdings, Inc.. (Truxler, Christopher)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Winco Holdings, Inc. (Truxler, Christopher)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Winco Holdings, Inc.. (Truxler, Christopher)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVDS2009169 Receipt No: ACACDC-27138112 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Winco Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Answer) (Attorney Christopher J Truxler added to party Winco Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft))(Truxler, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven V. Mendoza v. Winco Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winco Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J Truxler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winco Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J Truxler
Represented By: Lindsay Stevens Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernie Last Name Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Last Name Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Name Unknown McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven V. Mendoza
Represented By: Jay S Rothman
Represented By: Timothy E Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?