Gebregiorgis Zerisenay v. United States of America
Petitioner: Gebregiorgis Zerisenay
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv01390
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE filed by petitioner Gebregiorgis Zerisenay. (vm)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alarice M Medrano counsel for Respondent United States of America. Adding Alarice M. Medrano as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Medrano, Alarice)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Gebregiorgis Zerisenay. (vm)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: SERVICE ON UNITED STATES ATTORNEY by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. A Civil Division AUSA will file a notice of appearance within 14 days. The government will then have 30 days after that to respond (by motion, answer, or otherwise) to Petitioners submissions. (See Minute Order for further details) Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Statement) (vm)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause filed by Petitioner Gebregiorgis Zerisenay. Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Order to Show Cause, #3 (vm)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Petitioners response to this order (not to exceed five pages) will be due by August 21. Alternatively, Petitioner may file a statement voluntarily dismissing the action without further consequence or cost. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111, #2 IFP) (lh)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) filed as Motion to Dismiss Immigration Detainer. Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.(Filing fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Gebregiorgis Zerisenay. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gebregiorgis Zerisenay v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Alarice M Medrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gebregiorgis Zerisenay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?