In Re Debtor Asif Aziz
Appellant: Asif Azis
Debtor: Asif Aziz
Appellee: NewRez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 5:2020cv01391
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Text Entry Order STRIKING MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal #9 . The Court requires a properly noticed motion to be filed.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Appellee NewRez LLC identifying Shellpoint Partners LLC as Corporate Parent. (Exnowski, Dane)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 *Stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Appellee NewRez LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice and Exhibits, #2 Certificate of Service) (Exnowski, Dane) Modified on 9/10/2020 (sr).
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Statement of Issues, Designation of Record, Notice of Transcript, Transcripts forwarded to Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge John F. Walter. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (jtil)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEAL DEFICIENCY TO APPELLANT. (jtil)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on June 14, 2020. (jtil)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL: filed by Appellant Asif Azis Re: Order Granting Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay Real Property entered on 7/1/2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Wayne E. Johnson, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 7/13/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 6:20-bk-11537, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: N/A. (Attachments: #1 BK Docket) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Debtor Asif Aziz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Asif Azis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Asif Aziz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NewRez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Dane Wyatt Exnowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?