Patricia Ann Littlejohn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Littlejohn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2020cv01404
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patricia Ann Littlejohn, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Torres. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Eddie Anderson. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Steve L. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Barasch, Stuart)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney In Seon Jeong added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Jeong, In)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security. re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 (vm)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT Updated March 2020) by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (vm)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 filed by Plaintiff Patricia Ann Littlejohn. (Barasch, Stuart)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Patricia Ann Littlejohn, (Barasch, Stuart)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Patricia Ann Littlejohn. (Barasch, Stuart)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Patricia Ann Littlejohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Stuart Barasch added to party Patricia Ann Littlejohn(pty:pla))(Barasch, Stuart)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Patricia Ann Littlejohn. (Barasch, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patricia Ann Littlejohn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: In Seon Jeong
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Littlejohn
Represented By: Stuart Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?