Daniel Edward Johnson v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Daniel Edwards Johnson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv01414
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV20-1414 E on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edwards Johnson. (Safa, Cyrus)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Edwards Johnson, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 8/4/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to General Counsel. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Safa, Cyrus)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (sp)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edwards Johnson. (Safa, Cyrus)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Plaintiff shall promptly serve the Summons and Complaint on defendant and shall a proof of such service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this aspect of this Order may result in the issuance of an Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute. It is Ordered that defendant's time to plead to the complaint is extended such that defendant's pleading must be filed within 90 days of service of the complaint. Defendant shall file a transcript of the administrative proceedings at the same time that defendant pleads to the complaint. A paper copy of the transcript of the administrative proceedings must be submitted directly to chambers within 24 hours of the time defendant pleads to the complaint. Within 30 days of the filing of plaintiff's motion for summary judgment or remand, defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment or remand. If either party believes that the case cannot be resolved by motion, such party shall so advise the Court and the opposing party in writing. The Court will take the motions under submission without oral argument, unless the Court otherwise orders. (sp)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Re Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sp)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edwards Johnson, (Safa, Cyrus)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edwards Johnson. (Safa, Cyrus)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edwards Johnson. (Safa, Cyrus)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edwards Johnson. (Safa, Cyrus)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Edwards Johnson. (Attorney Cyrus Safa added to party Daniel Edwards Johnson(pty:pla))(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Edward Johnson v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Timothy R Bolin
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Edwards Johnson
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?