Jacqueline Doe v. Rawls Law Group, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Doe
Defendant: Rawls Brewster, Rawls Law Group, P.C. and Brewster S. Rawls
Case Number: 5:2020cv01415
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 29 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Eastern District of Virginia, 3:20-cv-00669 filed 8/27/2020. (iv)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson transferring case to Eastern District of Virginia, Richmond Division. Case transferred electronically on 8/26/2020. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo)
August 26, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Brewster S. Rawls, Rawls Law Group, P.C., (Sohal, Vikram)
August 26, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): A proposed order shall be submitted as a separate attachment to the Motion or to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
August 25, 2020 Filing 25 EXHIBIT (COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS) to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 filed by Defendants Brewster S. Rawls, Rawls Law Group, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Sohal, Vikram)
August 25, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 filed by Defendants Brewster S. Rawls, Rawls Law Group, P.C.. (Sohal, Vikram)
August 25, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Vikram Sohal in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 filed by Defendants Brewster S. Rawls, Rawls Law Group, P.C.. (Sohal, Vikram)
August 25, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 filed by Defendants Brewster S. Rawls, Rawls Law Group, P.C.. (Sohal, Vikram)
August 25, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by defendants Brewster S. Rawls, Rawls Law Group, P.C.. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attorney Vikram Sohal added to party Brewster S. Rawls(pty:dft), Attorney Vikram Sohal added to party Rawls Law Group, P.C.(pty:dft)) (Sohal, Vikram)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS MINUTE ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court sets September 2, 2020 as the deadline for defendants to file their position to the Court's August 4, 2020 Order to Show Cause and plaintiff's request that the action be transferred to the Eastern District of Virginia. Defendants's failure to file a timely or adequate response to the August 4, 2020 Order to Show Cause may be deemed consent to the transfer of this action to the Eastern District of Virginia without further warning. The Court orders plaintiff's counsel to provide defendants's counsel with a copy of this Order and file a Proof of Service indicating service on defendants's counsel by no later than August 26, 2020. (see document for further details) (bm)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,, #14 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #18 , REQUEST for Order for response to the Court Order to Show Cause dated Aug 5, 2020 #17 filed by Plaintiff Jacqueline Doe (Feldman, David)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before August 31, 2020, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure to respond to this Order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to dismissal of thecomplaint. (lc)
August 6, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST for Order for response to the Court Order to Show Cause dated Aug 5, 2020 filed by plaintiff Jacqueline Doe. (Feldman, David)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Jacqueline Doe, upon Defendant Rawls Law Group, P.C. served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Traces Kyle, Practice Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Feldman, David)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jacqueline Doe, upon Defendant Brewster S. Rawls served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Traces Kyle, Practice Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Feldman, David)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. In this case, the Complaint does not provide the plaintiffs name. Instead, the Complaint identifies the plaintiff as Jacqueline Doe (Plaintiff). Plaintiff has not sought leave from this Court to proceed in this action under a pseudonym. Accordingly, the Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the Complaint should not be dismissed with leave to amend for failure to comply with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 10, 17, and Local Rule 11-3.8. The Court therefore orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why issue preclusion does not apply to the Los Angeles Superior Courts determination that a California court lacks personal jurisdiction over defendants and why, as a result, this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction. Plaintiffs response to this Order shall attach the Los Angeles Superior Courts Order on the Motion to Quash and shall be filed by no later than August 17, 2020. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Case number now reads as 5:20-cv-01415 PA(JCx). (rn)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-01415 DMG(SPx). (rn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Brewster S. Rawls, Rawls Law Group, P.C. (shb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Jacqueline Doe, (Feldman, David)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #6 filed by plaintiff Jacqueline Doe. (Feldman, David)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Notice to counsel re consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Eastern Division Blackout Case. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jacqueline Doe. (Feldman, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jacqueline Doe. (Feldman, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27256845 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Jacqueline Doe. (Attorney David Michael Feldman added to party Jacqueline Doe(pty:pla))(Feldman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacqueline Doe v. Rawls Law Group, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rawls Brewster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rawls Law Group, P.C.
Represented By: Michael McCarthy
Represented By: Vikram Sohal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brewster S. Rawls
Represented By: Michael McCarthy
Represented By: Vikram Sohal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Doe
Represented By: David Michael Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?