Karen Edmon v. Benjermine Schuler et al
Plaintiff: Karen Edmon
Defendant: County of Riverside, City of Jurpa, Officer Benjermine Schuler and City Limit
Case Number: 5:2020cv01428
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause, no later than August 24, 2020, why the action should not be dismissed. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Civil Rights Complaint Form, #2 Blank IFP Request Form) (hr)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) filed by plaintiff Karen Edmon. (esa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (2 of 2) filed by plaintiff Karen Edmon. (esa) Modified on 7/20/2020 (esa).
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (1 of 2) filed by plaintiff Karen Edmon, (esa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against defendantsCity Limit, City of Jurpa, County of Riverside, Benjermine Schuler Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, filed by plaintiff Karen Edmon. (Attachments: #1 1 of 2 CV71, #2 2 of 2 CV71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karen Edmon v. Benjermine Schuler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Riverside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jurpa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Benjermine Schuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Limit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Edmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?