James Rutherford v. Loma Linda University Shared Services et al
Plaintiff: JAMES RUTHERFORD, an individual and James Rutherford
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY SHARED SERVICES, a California corporation, Does 1-10, inclusive and Loma Linda University Shared Services
Case Number: 5:2020cv01444
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ERRATA AND WITHDRAWAL RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed by plaintiff James Rutherford. (Manning, Joseph)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Loma Linda University Shared Services re: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #16 (Schilt, E)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Loma Linda University Shared Services.(Attorney E Nathan Schilt added to party Loma Linda University Shared Services(pty:dft))(Schilt, E)
September 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 9/14/2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: An answer by the defendant(s); or, Plaintiff's application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed if the above-mentioned document(s) are not filed by the date indicated above. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff James Rutherford, upon Defendant Loma Linda University Shared Services acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Manning, Joseph)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim asserted in the Complaint #11 . Having reviewed and considered Plaintiff's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause #12 , the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claim. The Court therefore dismisses the state law claim without prejudice. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff James Rutherfordto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Order to Show Cause,,, #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM, #2 Declaration of Rutherford)(Manning, Joseph)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim. In responding to this Order to Show Cause, Plaintiff shall identify the amount of statutory damages Plaintiff seeks to recover. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by 8/10/2020. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of any such claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1367(c). See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Loma Linda University Shared Services. (ghap)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 Notice to counsel re consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Eastern Division Blackout Case. (ghap)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES RUTHERFORD, an individual. (Manning, Joseph)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JAMES RUTHERFORD, an individual. (Manning, Joseph)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff JAMES RUTHERFORD, an individual, (Manning, Joseph)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27291531 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff JAMES RUTHERFORD, an individual. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party JAMES RUTHERFORD, an individual(pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Rutherford v. Loma Linda University Shared Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY SHARED SERVICES, a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loma Linda University Shared Services
Represented By: E Nathan Schilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES RUTHERFORD, an individual
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rutherford
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?