Justin Bartlett v. All American Asphalt
Plaintiff: Justin Bartlett
Defendant: All American Asphalt and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv01449
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion, the Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. No. #9 ) and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court (Dkt. No. #13 ) set for hearing on September 21, 2020, is hereby continued to September 28, 2020, at 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Continue The September 28, 2020 Scheduling Conference and Extend Associated Deadlines #20 . NOTE CHANGES MADE BY COURT. ( Scheduling Conference continued to 11/30/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.) The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit the joint Rule 26(f) Report within fourteen (14) days of the newly scheduled Rule 16(b) conference. (twdb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant All American Asphalt, re Stipulation to Continue #20 , Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #19 served on September 14, 2020. (Lee, Kristalyn)
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 28, 2020 to 60 Days Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #8 filed by Defendant All American Asphalt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Kristalyn)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant All American Asphalt.. (Lee, Kristalyn)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY Plaintiff's Motion to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #13 filed by Plaintiff Justin Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joshua Milon, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Milon, Joshua)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #9 filed by Defendant All American Asphalt. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lee, Kristalyn)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #13 filed by Defendant All American Asphalt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Opposition, #2 Proof of Service)(Lee, Kristalyn)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #9 filed by Plaintiff Justin Bartlett. (Milon, Joshua)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of interested party. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Justin Bartlett. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joshua Milon, #2 Declaration Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Milon, Joshua)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 Notice filed by Plaintiff Justin Bartlett of Interested Parties (Milon, Joshua)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant All American Asphalt, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #9 , Request for Judicial Notice #10 served on August 19, 2020. (Payne, Mark)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #9 filed by Defendant All American Asphalt. (Payne, Mark)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant All American Asphalt. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Proposed Order) (Payne, Mark)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
July 21, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant All American Asphalt. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/17/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
July 21, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants All American Asphalt, Does 1 through 50. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Justin Bartlett. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/11/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant All American Asphalt, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 7/21/20. (Payne, Mark)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant All American Asphalt, (Payne, Mark)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant All American Asphalt. (Payne, Mark)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC2001592 Receipt No: ACACDC-27299106 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant All American Asphalt. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Complaint, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C - Answer, #4 Declaration of Michael Farkas, #5 Exhibits 1 - 2) (Attorney Mark J Payne added to party All American Asphalt(pty:dft))(Payne, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justin Bartlett v. All American Asphalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Bartlett
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Milon
Represented By: Yesenia Cardoza
Represented By: Angel D Pluas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All American Asphalt
Represented By: Mark J Payne
Represented By: Kristalyn Fon Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?