Wesley Parker Weltch v. Officer Bogh et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Parker Weltch
Defendant: Officer Vest, Officer Castillo, Officer Bogh and Officer Morris
Case Number: 5:2020cv01459
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Text Only Entry Re Order on Request re Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The clerk mailed order to plaintiff's new address. (CV-93) #4 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of address. Changing Plaintiff's address to Central Detention Center-San Bernardino, 630 E. Rialto Ave., San Bernardino, CA 92415 filed by Plaintiff Wesley Parker Weltch. (vm)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: DENYING Notice of Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV-93) #2 with leave to amend withing 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. (et)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) (lh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Bogh(official capacity), Bogh(individual), Castillo(individual), Castillo(official capacity), Morris, Morris, Vest(official capacity), Vest(individual) pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Filed by Plaintiff Wesley Parker Weltch. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesley Parker Weltch v. Officer Bogh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Vest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Parker Weltch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?