Red Oaks Villas v. Ashley Williams et al
Case Number: 5:2020cv01466
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Eastern Division - Riverside Office
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of Calif., County of San Bernardino, Fontana Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of Calif., County of San Bernardino, Fontana Superior Court. (twdb)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal Remanding Case to Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case number UDFS2001146. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is REMANDED to the Superior Court of California listed above, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (twdb)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Denying #3 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (twdb)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the wrong Magistrate Judge's initials were put on the documents Re: Notice of Removal, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 . The correct Magistrate Judge is Kenly Kiya Kato, and the correct initials should be KK. All documents in regards to this case should read case number 5:20-cv-01466-JGB(KKx) (car)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by Defendant Ashley Williams. (car)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ashley Williams (car)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA County of San Bernardino, case number UDFS2001146 with non-conformed copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, filed by Defendant Ashley Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Oaks Villas v. Ashley Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?