Timmy Max Cunningham v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Timmy Max Cunningham
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv01484
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV20-1484 AGR on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
August 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Timmy Max Cunningham. (Kuntz, William)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Amanda Schapel added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Schapel, Amanda)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Timmy Max Cunningham, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 8/6/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Torres, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Carly Sase, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown Signer, Title Unknown, on behalf of General Counsel. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Case Management Orders were also served along with Complaint documents. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAS BEEN REVISED EFFECTIVE JANUARY 2016. PLEASE REVIEW THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. In accordance with General Order 05-01, this case is designated for electronic filing. A chambers copy is required only for the joint stipulation and the certified administrative record. In order to facilitate the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this case, the parties shall comply with the following instructions: (see document for further details). (hr)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (ghap)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Timmy Max Cunningham. (Kuntz, William)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Timmy Max Cunningham, identifying Unitied States of America and Social Security Administration. (Kuntz, William)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Timmy Max Cunningham. (Kuntz, William)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27367569 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Timmy Max Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William M Kuntz added to party Timmy Max Cunningham(pty:pla))(Kuntz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timmy Max Cunningham v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Amanda Schapel
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timmy Max Cunningham
Represented By: William M Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?