Joshua Chance v. United States of America
Petitioner: Joshua Chance
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2020cv01579
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
2 Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 20-128) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., this case is transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-01579-SB-JEM. (aco)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. To date, Petitioner has failed to file a FAP, has not requested an extension of time, and has not otherwise explained his failure to comply with the filing deadline. Accordingly, Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or failure to comply with a Court order based on Petitioner's failure to file a FAP. Petitioner shall file a written response to this Order to Show Cause no later than October 8, 2020. Cause may be shown if Petitioner files a FAP by this deadline or adequately explains his failure to do so. (lom)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 from Joshua Chance. Re: MISCELLANEOUS - event converted from ICMS #1 . Receipt number LA210411. (fr)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott: If Petitioner elects to pursue this action, he is ORDERED to file an amended petition rectifying the deficiencies identified above no later than September 17, 2020. The clerk is directed to send Petitioner a blank Section 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus form for this purpose. (see document for details.0 (Attachments: #1 Attach.1) (es)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 and CV-27) (ghap)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Western
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINAL ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/7/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SUA SPONTE TRANSFERRING CAUSE TO THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, EASTERN DIVISION. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/7/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter. (slt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/7/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5), filed by Joshua Chance.(slt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joshua Chance v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?