In Re Debtor Clifford Allen Brace, Jr.
Appellant: Clifford Allen Brace, Jr.
Appellee: Steven M. Speier
Case Number: 5:2020cv01641
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 APPELLANT'S EXCERPTS OF THE RECORD IN SUPPORT OF OPENING BRIEF filed by Appellant Clifford Allen Brace, Jr. Re: Appellants Opening Brief #12 (bm)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF filed by Appellant Clifford Allen Brace, Jr. (bm)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 10/8/2020. (mrgo)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment, #1 . (mrgo)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:19-cv-00290 JGB. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-01641 JGB. Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal (rn)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ON EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL by Judge Percy Anderson re: #7 MOTION to Stay Case. For the foregoing reasons, Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal is denied. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL filed by appellant Clifford Allen Brace, Jr. (mrgo)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California (See Order for further details) (yl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (jtil)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Transfer of Appeal to District Court. (jtil)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 7/30/2020. (jtil)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL: filed by Appellant Clifford Allen Brace, Jr. Re: Order Re Further Adjudication of Civil Contempt Including Bodily Detention of Debtor, Clifford Allen Brace, Jr., entered on 7/22/2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Scott H. Yun, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 7/29/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 6:11-bk-26154-SY, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: CC-20-1190. (Attachments: #1 BK Docket) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Debtor Clifford Allen Brace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Clifford Allen Brace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Steven M. Speier
Represented By: Judith Marshack
Represented By: D Edward Hays
Represented By: Tinho Mang
Represented By: Judith E Marshack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?