Xiaohua Huang v. We Buy Used IT Equipment
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Defendant: We Buy Used IT Equipment
Case Number: 5:2020cv01650
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
2 Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Entry of Default against defendant DTC Computer Supplies Corp (We Buy Used IT Equipment) #17 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Answer on file dated on 9/28/2020 (Dkt. #9 ). (jp)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt granting #7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (jp)
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant We Buy Used IT Equipment, identifying DTC Computer Supplies Corp.. (Lauritsen, Eric)
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric Carl Lauritsen counsel for Defendant We Buy Used IT Equipment. Adding Eric C. Lauritsen as counsel of record for DTC Computer Supplies Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant DTC Computer Supplies Corp.. (Attorney Eric Carl Lauritsen added to party We Buy Used IT Equipment(pty:dft))(Lauritsen, Eric)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant DTC Computer Supplies Corp erroneously sued as We Buy Used IT Equipment #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel shall file the Notice of Interested Parties on or before 10/5/2020. Failure to file the notice may result in the document being stricken. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/11/2020. (vv)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Entry of Default against defendant DTC Computer Supplies Corp (We Buy Used IT Equipment) filed by plaintiff Xiaohua Huang. (jp)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xiaohua Huang, upon Defendant We Buy Used IT Equipment served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon X. Sun, Person Accept Service on behalf of We buy Used IT Equipment in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Mail Service. Original Summons returned. Copy of original US Postal Service Tracking attached. (jp)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE to Correct the name of Defendant filed by plaintiff Xiaohua Huang. (jp)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant DTC Computer Supplies Corp., erroneously sued as We Buy Used IT Equipment We Buy Used IT Equipment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Answer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Answer)(Attorney K Andrew Kent added to party We Buy Used IT Equipment(pty:dft))(Kent, K)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xiaohua Huang, upon Defendant We Buy Used IT Equipment served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon (Name of Person Accept Service Not specified) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Mail Service. Original Summons returned. Copy of original US Postal Service Tracking attached. (jp)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Xiaohua Huang. (jp)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 5:20-CV-01650-JAK-SHKx. (aco)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant We Buy Used IT Equipment. (lh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant We Buy Used IT Equipment. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani.(Filing fee $400 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Xiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiaohua Huang v. We Buy Used IT Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: We Buy Used IT Equipment
Represented By: Eric Carl Lauritsen
Represented By: K Andrew Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?