OGA USA, Inc. v. Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Plaintiff: OGA USA, INC.
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and DOES 1 to 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv01661
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2021 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 4/30/2021 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2021 at 8:30 AM. (iv)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on September 28, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: January 11, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: January 15, 2021. (iv)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT filed by Plaintiff OGA USA, INC.. (Geurts, Phillip)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company.(Swerdlow, Alan)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for September 28, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before September 14, 2020. (iv)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 25, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge John F. Walter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-01661 JFW (SPx). (jtil)
August 18, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff OGA USA, INC. in Riverside Superior Court on 7/22/2020, attached to Swerdlow Decl. (jtil)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company, identifying PLAINTIFF, OGA USA, INC.. (Swerdlow, Alan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Swerdlow, Alan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Alan E. Swerdlow re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Swerdlow, Alan) (iv). (Attachment(s): #1 Part 2)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court of California, case number RIC 2002830 Receipt No: ACACDC-27675159 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Attorney Alan E Swerdlow added to party Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Swerdlow, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OGA USA, Inc. v. Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OGA USA, INC.
Represented By: Phillip Ray Geurts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan E Swerdlow
Represented By: Christopher K Whang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?