Kathy Pertheress Price v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Kathy Pertheress Price
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv01665
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV20-1665 RAO on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Paul H Sachelari added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Sachelari, Paul)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Kathy Pertheress Price. (Kalagian, Marc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kathy Pertheress Price, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/10/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kalagian, Marc)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (dml)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (dml)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #5 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dml)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Kathy Pertheress Price. (Kalagian, Marc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kathy Pertheress Price, (Kalagian, Marc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathy Pertheress Price. (Kalagian, Marc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kathy Pertheress Price. (Kalagian, Marc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Kathy Pertheress Price. (Attorney Marc V Kalagian added to party Kathy Pertheress Price(pty:pla))(Kalagian, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathy Pertheress Price v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Paul H Sachelari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Pertheress Price
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?