Tonisha Wrenn v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Tonisha Wrenn
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv01666
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV20-1666 PVC on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Tonisha Wrenn. (Kalagian, Marc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tonisha Wrenn, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/10/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kalagian, Marc)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. (see document for further details) (hr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (car)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tonisha Wrenn, (Kalagian, Marc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tonisha Wrenn. (Kalagian, Marc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tonisha Wrenn. (Kalagian, Marc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27680815 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tonisha Wrenn. (Attorney Marc V Kalagian added to party Tonisha Wrenn(pty:pla))(Kalagian, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tonisha Wrenn v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Marla K Letellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonisha Wrenn
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?