Irene Esquibel v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Irene Esquibel
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv01669
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV20-1669 AFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Lynn M Harada added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Harada, Lynn)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Irene Esquibel. (Haley, Denise)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Irene Esquibel, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/9/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to General Counsel. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haley, Denise)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (es)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Irene Esquibel. (Haley, Denise)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (es)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (In Chambers): ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL1 by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: *See order for details.* (es)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (es)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of interested parties filed by plaintiff Irene Esquibel. (Haley, Denise)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Irene Esquibel. (Haley, Denise)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Irene Esquibel. (Haley, Denise)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Irene Esquibel. (Haley, Denise)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Irene Esquibel. (Attorney Denise Bourgeois Haley added to party Irene Esquibel(pty:pla))(Haley, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irene Esquibel v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Lynn M Harada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Esquibel
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?