Annie Lynn Yennie v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Annie Lynn Yennie
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv01671
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV20-1671 JPR on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Lara A Bradt added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Bradt, Lara)
August 29, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Annie Lynn Yennie. (Safa, Cyrus)
August 29, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annie Lynn Yennie, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 8/24/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to General Counsel. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Safa, Cyrus)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Annie Lynn Yennie. Response to request for statement re: Conflict of interest (Safa, Cyrus)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (See order for details.) (es)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re Possible Conflicts of Interest by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: The Court has a conflict of interest in hearing any matter in which Social Security Administration ALJ Robin Rosenbluth, who sits in West Los Angeles, has participated or presided. No later than seven days from the date of this order, Plaintiff's counsel must file notice that ALJ Rosenbluth did or did not participate in or preside over Plaintiff's case. (See document for details.) (es)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (jtil)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Annie Lynn Yennie. (Safa, Cyrus)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Annie Lynn Yennie, (Safa, Cyrus)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Annie Lynn Yennie. (Safa, Cyrus)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Annie Lynn Yennie. (Safa, Cyrus)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27687777 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Annie Lynn Yennie. (Attorney Cyrus Safa added to party Annie Lynn Yennie(pty:pla))(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Annie Lynn Yennie v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Lara A Bradt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Lynn Yennie
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?