Felicia Jackson v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Felicia Jackson
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC and DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv01681
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-01681 DOC(KKx). (rn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge James V. Selna. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-01681 JVS (KKx). (jtil)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC in Riverside Superior Court on 8/12/2020, attached as Exhibit C.(jtil)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Felicia Jackson in Riverside Superior Court on 7/8/2020, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Jury Demand #4 served on August 19, 2020. (Chu, Derrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Chu, Derrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, identifying Daimler North America Corporation. (Chu, Derrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Chu, Derrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court-Southwest Justice Center, case number MCC2001252 Receipt No: ACACDC-27700475 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Derrick Y. Chu, #2 Exhibit A- Lease Agreement, #3 Exhibit B-Summons and Compalint, #4 Exhibit C- Answer to Complaint, #5 Exhibit D- Email of Deal Jacket) (Attorney Derrick Y Chu added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Chu, Derrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felicia Jackson v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Derrick Y Chu
Represented By: Anthony Paul Greco
Represented By: Kate S Lehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Jackson
Represented By: David N Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?