John W. Hermann v. County of San Bernardino et al
Plaintiff: John W. Hermann
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, Deputy Paul Casas, County of San Bernardino and Deputy Ryan Cook
Case Number: 5:2020cv01682
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ryan Cook answer now due 11/20/2020; Paul Casas answer now due 11/20/2020; County of San Bernardino answer now due 11/20/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Ryan Cook; Paul Casas; County of San Bernardino.(Attorney Laurel Ann Hoehn added to party Paul Casas(pty:dft), Attorney Laurel Ann Hoehn added to party Ryan Cook(pty:dft), Attorney Laurel Ann Hoehn added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:dft))(Hoehn, Laurel)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Paul Casas, Ryan Cook and County of San Bernardino. (jtil)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 Notice to counsel re consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Eastern Division Blackout Case. (jtil)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff John W. Hermann, (Artan, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff John W. Hermann. (Artan, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff John W. Hermann. (Artan, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27701871 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff John W. Hermann. (Attorney Michael H Artan added to party John W. Hermann(pty:pla))(Artan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John W. Hermann v. County of San Bernardino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Paul Casas
Represented By: Laurel Ann Hoehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Bernardino
Represented By: Laurel Ann Hoehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Ryan Cook
Represented By: Laurel Ann Hoehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Hermann
Represented By: Michael H Artan
Represented By: Glen T Jonas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?