Javier Lozano v. Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP et al
Plaintiff: Javier Lozano
Defendant: Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv01683
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge William D. Keller, re Stipulation for Protective Order #18 (dc)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP.(Choi, Kathleen)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2021 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 9/10/2021 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 9/21/2021 at 8:30 AM. (iv)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on September 28, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: April 19, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: April 23, 2021. (iv)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Rule 26 Report #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - Other Filings - Pretrial and Trial Documents -Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT of for Rule 26 Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Javier Lozano. (Aloupas, George)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #12 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 28, 2020 to October 5 or October 19, 2020 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only,, #8 filed by defendant Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Choi, Kathleen)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form, #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Supplement #10 served on August 28, 2020. (Choi, Kathleen)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT filed by Defendant Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Choi, Kathleen)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Johnnie A. James Lead Trial Counsel in Compliance with Court's Standing Order Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP. (James, Johnnie)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for September 28, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before September 14, 2020. (iv)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 100, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge John F. Walter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-01683-JFW (SHKx). (ghap)
August 19, 2020 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT G, Page 23)(ghap)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, inclusive, Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Javier Lozano. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/16/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT D, Page 8) (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant's Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP, identifying Leovia Logistics LP (Delaware), Neovia Logistics Intermediate Holdings, LP. (Choi, Kathleen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP. (Choi, Kathleen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS2012588 Receipt No: ACACDC-27703885 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Hurtado, #2 Declaration of Kathleen Choi, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kathleen Choi, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kathleen Choi, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kathleen Choi, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Kathleen Choi (Complaint), #7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Kathleen Choi, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Kathleen Choi, #9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Kathleen Choi (Answer)) (Attorney Kathleen J Choi added to party Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP(pty:dft))(Choi, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Javier Lozano v. Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP
Represented By: Kathleen J Choi
Represented By: Johnnie A James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Lozano
Represented By: George Andrew Aloupas
Represented By: Michael K Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?