Melissa A. Bates v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Melissa A. Bates
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv01684
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV20-1684 MAA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Patrick W Snyder added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Snyder, Patrick)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Melissa A. Bates. (Perales, Monica)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Melissa A. Bates, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 8/28/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to General Counsel. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perales, Monica)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS WITH A PRO SE LITIGANT by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. [See document for details.] (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (et)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (es)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: Granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (es)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Melissa A. Bates, (Perales, Monica)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Melissa A. Bates. (Perales, Monica)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Melissa A. Bates. (Perales, Monica)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Melissa A. Bates. (Perales, Monica)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Melissa A. Bates. (Attorney Monica Perales added to party Melissa A. Bates(pty:pla))(Perales, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melissa A. Bates v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Patrick W Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa A. Bates
Represented By: Monica Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?