David Calderon v. San Bernardino County Sheriffs et al
Plaintiff: David Calderon
Defendant: San Bernardino County Sheriffs and Officer Simonson
Case Number: 5:2020cv01688
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: RE #9 REQUEST for Order; RE g #10 REQUEST for Order. SEE ORDER. (dc)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST for Telephone Appearances filed by Plaintiff David Calderon. (hr)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST for Pro Per Status & Access to the Law Library filed by Plaintiff David Calderon. (hr)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: #7 REQUEST for Extension of Time to Amend. Good cause appearing, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Request. Plaintiff's FAC is now due on or before December 21, 2020. (dc)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for a 90 Day Extension of Time to Rewrite My Claim as a "First Amended Complaint" filed by Plaintiff David Calderon. (hr)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (Attachments: #1 Blank CV Rights Form, #2 Blank Dismissal Form) (dc)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (dc)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee.. It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $18.74 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (dc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff David Calderon. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants San Bernardino County Sheriffs, Simonson pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, filed by plaintiff David Calderon. (esa) Modified on 8/21/2020 (esa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Calderon v. San Bernardino County Sheriffs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino County Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Simonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?