Dr. Daniel Lieberman v. Unum Group et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Daniel Lieberman
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and Unum Group
Case Number: 5:2020cv01798
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group, (Maguire, Daniel)
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #13 Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group.(Maguire, Daniel)
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Glenn R Kantor on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel Lieberman (Kantor, Glenn)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Daniel Lieberman(Kantor, Glenn)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 10/23/2020; Unum Group answer now due 10/23/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants UNUM Life Insurance Company of America; Unum Group.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Unum Group(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Lieberman, upon Defendant Unum Group served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent, by serving Koy Saechao - Authorized Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Glenn)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Lieberman, upon Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent, by serving Koy Saechao - Authorized Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Glenn)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan M Feigenbaum. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group. (esa)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dr. Daniel Lieberman, (Kantor, Glenn)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dr. Daniel Lieberman. (Kantor, Glenn)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dr. Daniel Lieberman. (Kantor, Glenn)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27875939 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Dr. Daniel Lieberman. (Attorney Glenn R Kantor added to party Dr. Daniel Lieberman(pty:pla))(Kantor, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dr. Daniel Lieberman v. Unum Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Daniel Lieberman
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Represented By: Jonathan M Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Melissa M Cowan
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Melissa M Cowan
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?