Salvador Sevillano Ochoa v. FCA US LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Salvador Sevillano Ochoa
Defendant: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Does 1 through 10 and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01818
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
September 3, 2020 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant FCA US LLC. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 5)(esa)
September 3, 2020 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Salvador Sevillano Ochoa, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 8/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
September 3, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, FCA US LLC, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Salvador Sevillano Ochoa. (filed in state court 7/10/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 4, p. 5) (esa)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 served on 9/3/2020. (Gregg, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, identifying FCA North America Holdings, LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.. (Gregg, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Gregg, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael J Gregg counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. Adding Mark W. Skanes as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Gregg, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael J Gregg counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. Adding Michael J. Gregg as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Gregg, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS2014212 Receipt No: ACACDC-27921131 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration MJG, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Attorney Michael J Gregg added to party FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company(pty:dft))(Gregg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvador Sevillano Ochoa v. FCA US LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Michael J Gregg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Michael J Gregg
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Sevillano Ochoa
Represented By: Kevin Y Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?