Juan Calderon v. Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Calderon
Defendant: Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc., Peter Baronoff and Does 1-50, Inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv01875
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside Superior Court. (yl)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF PLAINTIFF JUAN CALDERON TO REMAND #12 by Judge John W. Holcomb: For the foregoing reasons, Calderon's Motion to Remand is GRANTED. This case is REMANDED to the Riverside County Superior Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (MOTION to Remand Case to State Court Case Remanded to Riverside County Superior Court. MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTES OF VIDEO HEARING RE: MOTION TO REMAND #12 held before Judge John W. Holcomb Counsel state their appearances. The Court confers with counsel and hears oral argument. The Court takes the matter under submission. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (yl)
November 6, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by Defendant Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc..(Wunderlich, Brittany)
October 30, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Party Name filed by Defendant Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wunderlich, Brittany)
October 30, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike, #14 filed by Defendants Peter Baronoff, Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc.. (Wunderlich, Brittany)
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Party, #15 filed by Defendant Peter Baronoff. (Wunderlich, Brittany)
October 30, 2020 Filing 18 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court- Southwest Justice Center #12 filed by Defendant Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michelle Bird in Support of Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Bird Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Bird Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Bird Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Bird Declaration)(Wunderlich, Brittany)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc. a Delaware Corporation; and Does 1-50, Inclusive Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Juan Calderon Juan Calderon(Crosner, Zachary)
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Peter Baronoff filed by Defendant Peter Baronoff. Motion set for hearing on 11/13/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Fischbein, Jason)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Peter Baronoff, Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/13/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fischbein, Jason)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court- Southwest Justice Center #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No proposed order attached. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court- Southwest Justice Center filed by Plaintiff Juan Calderon Juan Calderon. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Crosner, Zachary)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John W. Holcomb, United States District Judge. Judge Holcomb is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Holcomb's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Peter Baronoff answer now due 10/16/2020; Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc. answer now due 10/16/2020, re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #8 , Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Peter Baronoff; Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc..(Fischbein, Jason)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-148) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge John W. Holcomb, this case is transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-01875 JWH(SPx). (rn)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Peter Baronoff answer now due 10/9/2020; Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc. answer now due 10/9/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Peter Baronoff; Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc..(Fischbein, Jason)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-01875 AB (SPx). (car)
September 11, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Peter Baronoff, Does 1-50, Inclusive, Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Juan Calderon. Filed in State Court on 10/18/19 Submitted with Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc. identifying Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Fischbein, Jason)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Peter Baronoff, Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc., identifying Juan Calderon; Crosner Legal, P.C.; Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc.; and Peter Baronoff. (Fischbein, Jason)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Peter Baronoff, Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc.. (Fischbein, Jason)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number MCC2001482 Receipt No: ACACDC-28046109 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Peter Baronoff, Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Summons upon Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc., #3 State Court Summons upon Peter Baronoff, #4 State Court Complaint, #5 State Court Certificate of Counsel, #6 State Court Notice of Judicial Assignment and Case Management Conference) (Attorney Jason A Fischbein added to party Peter Baronoff(pty:dft), Attorney Jason A Fischbein added to party Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc.(pty:dft))(Fischbein, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juan Calderon v. Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians for Healthy Hospitals, Inc.
Represented By: Jason A Fischbein
Represented By: David Enrique Amaya
Represented By: Brittany Marie Wunderlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Baronoff
Represented By: Jason A Fischbein
Represented By: David Enrique Amaya
Represented By: Brittany Marie Wunderlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Calderon
Represented By: Branden Caroline Hamilton
Represented By: Michael R Crosner
Represented By: Zachary Crosner
Represented By: Blake R Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?