Fernando Aguayo Ramirez v. WinCo Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fernando Aguayo Ramirez
Defendant: WinCo Holdings, Inc. and Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv01943
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE AMENDED STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO SUBMIT JOINT REPORT AND CORRESPONDING DEADLINES (DKT. #12 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. The deadline for the parties to submit a Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report is continued from November 6, 2020 to December 7, 2020, and all corresponding deadlines are continued accordingly. (jp)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to AMENDED Stipulation to Continue #11 filed by Defendant WinCo Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kwan, Sophia)
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to Submit Joint Report and Corresponding Deadlines from November 6, 2020 to December 7, 2020 filed by Defendant WinCo Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kwan, Sophia)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant WinCo Holdings, Inc., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form, #6 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #8 , Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form, #5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #9 served on 9/22/2020. (Kwan, Sophia)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (jp)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCEORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/6/2020. (smo)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge John A. Kronstadt. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-01943 JAK (SPx). (ghap)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Sheri Pym. New Case Number 5:20-cv-01943 JGB (SPx). (ghap)
September 16, 2020 NON CONFORM FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant WinCo Holdings, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
September 16, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 50, Inclusive, WinCo Holdings, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Fernando Aguayo Ramirez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/2/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Winco Holdings, Inc., identifying Winco Holdings, Inc.. (Truxler, Christopher)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Winco Holdings, Inc. identifying Winco Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Truxler, Christopher)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Winco Holdings, Inc.. (Truxler, Christopher)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior, case number RIC2001438 Receipt No: ACACDC-28109621 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Winco Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Declaration of Yanz) (Attorney Christopher J Truxler added to party Winco Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft))(Truxler, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernando Aguayo Ramirez v. WinCo Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinCo Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J Truxler
Represented By: Sophia S Kwan
Represented By: Kristina M Launey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Aguayo Ramirez
Represented By: Brandon J Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?