County of Riverside v. Dung T. Lam et al
Plaintiff: County of Riverside
Defendant: Dung T. Lam and Does 1-100
Petitioner: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY and Dung T lam
Case Number: 5:2020cv02013
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside County Superior Court - Southwest Justice Center. Case number: MCC2001735. (jp)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING CIVIL ACTION TO SUPERIOR COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Defendant's removal is improper for lack of federal question jurisdiction. The above-entitled case is ordered REMANDED to the Superior Court, County of Riverside, Case No. MCC2001735, for all further proceedings for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice (Other) #7 . The document is STRICKEN. Signature of counsel unknown. Plaintiff's counsel must sign. Incorrect filing event used. (jre)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 STRICKEN PER #8 - NOTICE Notice of Dismissal filed by Defendant Dung T. Lam. (Granby, George) Modified on 10/6/2020 (jre).
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71). You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Unredacted Document Notice of Removal of Case to Fed Court, 2 Unredacted Document Certificate of Interested Parties are attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge R. Gary Klausner. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-02013 RGK (JPRx). (ghap)
September 29, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Dung T. Lam., filed by plaintiff County of Riverside. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/3/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEETS-FILED as REQUEST Receipt No: ACACDC-28291575 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Dung T lam. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Notice of Removal of Case to Fed Court, #2 Unredacted Document Certificate of Interested Parties) (Attorney George Granby added to party Dung T lam(pty:bkmov))(Granby, George) Modified on 9/30/2020 (ghap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Riverside v. Dung T. Lam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dung T lam
Represented By: George Granby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dung T. Lam
Represented By: George Granby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Riverside
Represented By: Nazik N Hasan
Represented By: Gregory P Priamos
Represented By: Tiffany Nicole North
Represented By: Michelle Clack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?