Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West et al v. HCA Healthcare et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa Mondragon, Gladys Reyes, Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West, Ray Valdivia and Vanessa Campos Villalobos
Defendant: Riverside Healthcare System dba Riverside Community Hospital, Samuel N Hazen, HCA Healthcare, Jackie DeSouza-Van Blaricum, CEO of Riverside Community Hosptial, Samuel N. Hazen and Riverside Healthcare System L.P. doing business as Riverside Community Hospital
Case Number: 5:2020cv02054
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #18 filed by Defendant Riverside Healthcare System L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ginamarie Caya ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice ISO Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B-1 to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C-1 to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D-1 to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D-2 to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Exhibit Exhibit E to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #11 Exhibit Exhibit F to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #12 Exhibit Exhibit G to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #13 Exhibit Exhibit H to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #14 Exhibit Exhibit I to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #15 Exhibit Exhibit J to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #16 Exhibit Exhibit K to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #17 Exhibit Exhibit L to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #18 Exhibit Exhibit M to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #19 Exhibit Exhibit N to Caya Decl. ISO Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice)(Ikels, Zuzana)
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Riverside Healthcare System L.P.. Motion set for hearing on 1/8/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Z. Ikels ISO Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Ikels Decl. ISO Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Ikels Decl. ISO Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Ikels Decl. ISO Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Ikels, Zuzana)
November 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Motion to Strike filed by Defendant CEO of Riverside Community Hosptial, Jackie DeSouza-Van Blaricum, HCA Healthcare, Samuel N. Hazen. Motion set for hearing on 1/8/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Samuel Hazen ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration of Michael Bray ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration Declaration of Zuzana Ikels ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Ikels Decl. ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Ikels Decl. ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C to Ikels Decl. ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #7 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Ikels, Zuzana)
November 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West. Motion set for hearing on 1/8/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hanley, William)
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants CEO of Riverside Community Hosptial, Jackie DeSouza-Van Blaricum, HCA Healthcare, Samuel N. Hazen, Riverside Healthcare System L.P. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Gladys Reyes, Vanessa Mondragon, Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West, Ray Valdivia, Vanessa Campos Villalobos(Harland, Bruce)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CEO of Riverside Community Hosptial, Jackie DeSouza-Van Blaricum, HCA Healthcare, Samuel N. Hazen, Riverside Healthcare System L.P., served on 10/16/20. (Ikels, Zuzana)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO THE COMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND by Judge John W. Holcomb #12 Plaintiffs will file an amended complaint, if any, on or before October 28, 2020. Plaintiffs deadline to file their motion to remand, if any, shall be November 20, 2020. Responses and the Motion to Remand is December 6, 2020. Responses and the Motion to Remand is December 18, 2020. (See Order for further details) (yl)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Order Re Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendants' Responses to the Complaint and Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendant CEO of Riverside Community Hosptial, Jackie DeSouza-Van Blaricum, HCA Healthcare, Samuel N. Hazen, Riverside Healthcare System L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Responses to the Complaint and Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Attorney Zuzana S Ikels added to party CEO of Riverside Community Hosptial(pty:dft), Attorney Zuzana S Ikels added to party Jackie DeSouza-Van Blaricum(pty:dft))(Ikels, Zuzana)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to HCA Healthcare answer now due 10/28/2020; Samuel N. Hazen answer now due 10/28/2020; Riverside Healthcare System L.P. answer now due 10/28/2020; Jackie DeSouza-Van Blaricum answer now due 10/28/2020, filed by Defendant HCA Healthcare; Samuel N. Hazen; Riverside Healthcare System L.P..(Ikels, Zuzana)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant HCA Healthcare, Samuel N. Hazen, Riverside Healthcare System L.P., served on 10/05/2020. (Ikels, Zuzana)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Add and Terminate Judges the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. Due to clerical error the wrong magistrate judge was added to this new action case. (ghap)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William T Hanley counsel for Plaintiffs Vanessa Campos Villalobos, Vanessa Mondragon, Gladys Reyes, Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West, Ray Valdivia. Adding William T. Hanley as counsel of record for Service Employees International Union United Healthcare Workers West; Vanessa Mondragon; Gladys Reyes; Ray Valdivia; Vanessa Campos Villalobos for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Service Employees International Union United Healthcare Workers West; Vanessa Mondragon; Gladys Reyes; Ray Valdivia; Vanessa Campos Villalobos. (Attorney William T Hanley added to party Vanessa Campos Villalobos(pty:pla), Attorney William T Hanley added to party Vanessa Mondragon(pty:pla), Attorney William T Hanley added to party Gladys Reyes(pty:pla), Attorney William T Hanley added to party Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West(pty:pla), Attorney William T Hanley added to party Ray Valdivia(pty:pla))(Hanley, William)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bruce A Harland counsel for Plaintiffs Vanessa Campos Villalobos, Vanessa Mondragon, Gladys Reyes, Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West, Ray Valdivia. Adding Bruce A. Harland as counsel of record for Service Employees International Union United Healthcare Workers West; Vanessa Mondragon; Gladys Reyes; Ray Valdivia; Vanessa Campos Villalobos for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Service Employees International Union United Healthcare Workers West; Vanessa Mondragon; Gladys Reyes; Ray Valdivia; Vanessa Campos Villalobos. (Attorney Bruce A Harland added to party Vanessa Campos Villalobos(pty:pla), Attorney Bruce A Harland added to party Vanessa Mondragon(pty:pla), Attorney Bruce A Harland added to party Gladys Reyes(pty:pla), Attorney Bruce A Harland added to party Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West(pty:pla), Attorney Bruce A Harland added to party Ray Valdivia(pty:pla))(Harland, Bruce)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant HCA Healthcare, Samuel N Hazen, Riverside Healthcare System dba Riverside Community Hospital, served on 10/02/2020. (Ikels, Zuzana)
October 1, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CEO of Riverside Community Hosptial, Jackie DeSouza-Van Blaricum, HCA Healthcare, Samuel N. Hazen, Riverside Healthcare System L.P..(Filing fee $ 400) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Gladys Reyes, Vanessa Mondragon, Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West, Ray Valdivia, Vanessa Campos Villalobos. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/20/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
October 1, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gladys Reyes, Vanessa Mondragon, Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West, Ray Valdivia, Vanessa Campos Villalobos, upon Defendant Riverside Healthcare System L.P. served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/15/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT F) (ghap)
October 1, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gladys Reyes, Vanessa Mondragon, Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West, Ray Valdivia, Vanessa Campos Villalobos, upon Defendant Samuel N. Hazen served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kathryn Sasser, Attorney for Samuel Hazen in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/15/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT H) (ghap)
October 1, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gladys Reyes, Vanessa Mondragon, Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West, Ray Valdivia, Vanessa Campos Villalobos, upon Defendant HCA Healthcare served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/15/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT G) (ghap)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant Riverside Healthcare System L.P. dba Riverside Community Hospital's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Riverside Healthcare System dba Riverside Community Hospital identifying HCA Healthcare, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Miyar, Ramon)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants HCA Healthcare, Samuel N Hazen, Riverside Healthcare System dba Riverside Community Hospital. (Miyar, Ramon)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number RIC2003273 Receipt No: ACACDC-28346976 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants HCA Healthcare, Samuel N Hazen, Riverside Healthcare System dba Riverside Community Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Declaration Allen J. McKenna, #10 Declaration Joseph Peccoralo, #11 Declaration Ramon A. Miyar) (Attorney Ramon Andres Miyar added to party HCA Healthcare(pty:dft), Attorney Ramon Andres Miyar added to party Samuel N Hazen(pty:dft), Attorney Ramon Andres Miyar added to party Riverside Healthcare System dba Riverside Community Hospital(pty:dft))(Miyar, Ramon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West et al v. HCA Healthcare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Mondragon
Represented By: Bruce A Harland
Represented By: William T Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Reyes
Represented By: Bruce A Harland
Represented By: William T Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union-United Healthcare Workers West
Represented By: Bruce A Harland
Represented By: William T Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Valdivia
Represented By: Bruce A Harland
Represented By: William T Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Campos Villalobos
Represented By: Bruce A Harland
Represented By: William T Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Healthcare System dba Riverside Community Hospital
Represented By: Ramon Andres Miyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel N Hazen
Represented By: Ramon Andres Miyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Healthcare
Represented By: Ramon Andres Miyar
Represented By: Cheryl A Sabnis
Represented By: Zuzana S Ikels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie DeSouza-Van Blaricum
Represented By: Zuzana S Ikels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO of Riverside Community Hosptial
Represented By: Zuzana S Ikels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel N. Hazen
Represented By: Ramon Andres Miyar
Represented By: Cheryl A Sabnis
Represented By: Zuzana S Ikels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Healthcare System L.P. doing business as Riverside Community Hospital
Represented By: Ramon Andres Miyar
Represented By: Cheryl A Sabnis
Represented By: Zuzana S Ikels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?