United States of America v. Douglas P. Nelson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Douglas P Nelson, Christine K Nelson, State of California Franchise Tax Board, Douglas P Nelsen, Trustee of the St Agnes Investments, 52-9873134 Trust Dated December 4, 1998, Christine K Nelsen, Stewart Title of California, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., St Agnes Investments, 52-9873134 Trust Dated December 4, 1998, Douglas P. Nelson, Christine K. Nelsen, U.S. Bank N.A., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC and Doulgas P. Nelsen
Case Number: 5:2020cv02084
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ernesto Valdez, Manager of JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shariff, Najah)
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant State of California Franchise Tax Board served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon State of California Franchise Tax Board in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shariff, Najah)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shariff, Najah)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #9 as to Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Christine K Nelson, Douglas P. Nelson, St Agnes Investments, 52-9873134 Trust Dated December 4, 1998, State of California Franchise Tax Board, Stewart Title of California, Inc., Trustee of the St Agnes Investments, 52-9873134 Trust Dated December 4, 1998, U.S. Bank N.A. (bm)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,, #9 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Shariff, Najah)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Christine K Nelson, Douglas P. Nelson, St Agnes Investments, 52-9873134 Trust Dated December 4, 1998, State of California Franchise Tax Board, Stewart Title of California, Inc., Trustee of the St Agnes Investments, 52-9873134 Trust Dated December 4, 1998, U.S. Bank N.A., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shariff, Najah)
October 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Bank of America, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Christine K Nelson, Douglas P. Nelson, St Agnes Investments, 52-9873134 Trust Dated December 4, 1998, State of California Franchise Tax Board, Stewart Title of California, Inc., Trustee of the St Agnes Investments, 52-9873134 Trust Dated December 4, 1998. (ghap)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 4 . Document number 4 due to clerical error. The docket clerk failed to attach the entire image and wrong fileddated of the new action (ghap)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 10/8/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 5] NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap) Modified on 10/8/2020 (ghap).
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Shariff, Najah)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Shariff, Najah)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Najah J Shariff added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Shariff, Najah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Douglas P. Nelson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas P Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine K Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas P Nelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee of the St Agnes Investments, 52-9873134 Trust Dated December 4, 1998
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine K Nelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Agnes Investments, 52-9873134 Trust Dated December 4, 1998
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas P. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine K. Nelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doulgas P. Nelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Najah J Shariff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?