Jodi Allen v. Lowes Homes Centers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JODI ALLEN
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC, Lowes Home Centers, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv02139
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2021 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 8/13/2021 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/24/2021 at 8:30 AM. (iv)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on November 23, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: April 12, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: April 16, 2021. (iv)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC.. (Rivera, Diana)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 23, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before November 9, 2020. (iv)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 50, inclusive.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge John F. Walter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-02139 JFW (KKx). (lh)
October 14, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/25/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 14, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Lowes Home Centers, LLC, filed by Plaintiff Jodi Allen. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/13/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC, (Forman, Stephanie)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC.. (Forman, Stephanie)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Forman, Stephanie)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS2016451 Receipt No: ACACDC-28528363 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Stephanie Forman added to party LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC(pty:dft))(Forman, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jodi Allen v. Lowes Homes Centers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JODI ALLEN
Represented By: Raymond Ghermezian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Diana Michelle Rivera
Represented By: Stephanie Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?