Judith L. Pottroff v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Judith L. Pottroff
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation and Does 1 to 30
Case Number: 5:2020cv02142
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 Answer of Costco Wholesale Corporation to Plaintiff's Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Blackwell, Kristi)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: SEE BELOW UNDER OTHER.. Other error(s) with document(s): This case originated as a Notice of Removal which contained a conformed copy of state court complaint. However plaintiff filed a "COMPLAINT", clerk unable to determine if plaintiff was attempting to file an Amended Complaint if appropriate.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is accepted as filed. The Court will deem this version of the complaint as the "Federal Complaint". (lc)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid, filed by plaintiff Judith L. Pottroff.(Allor, David) Modified on 11/10/2020 (lc). (DEEMED AS THE "FEDERAL COMPLAINT" PER COURT ORDER G112B RESPONSE DOCKET NO. 12)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI (SEE DOCUMENT FOR COMPLIANCE REQUIREMENTS AND SERVICE OF THIS ORDER ON ALL PARTIES BY PLAINTIFF OR DEFENDANT IF CASE CAME TO THE COURT AS A PETITION FOR REMOVAL) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi (lc)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 5 Civil Cover Sheet and No. 6 Declaration Notice of Interested Parties - Costo should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Entry No. 3 Notice of Assignment was inadvertently docketed. Please disregard Document No. 3 and refer to Docket Entry No. 5. Re: Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #3 (lh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-02142 MCS (SHKx). (lh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:20-cv-02142 MCS (SHKx). (lh)
October 12, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Does 1 to 30, filed by Plaintiff Judith L. Pottroff. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/13/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA County of San Bernardino, case number CIVDS2000997 Receipt No: ACACDC-28492737 - Fee: $400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - Costco, #6 Declaration Notice of Interested Parties - Costo, #7 Declaration Demand for Jury Trial - Costco) (Attorney Kristi Blackwell added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:bkmov))(Blackwell, Kristi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judith L. Pottroff v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Robert F Tyson, Jr
Represented By: Christopher H Schon
Represented By: Kristi Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith L. Pottroff
Represented By: David William Allor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?