Cesar Martinez v. AutoZone, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cesar Martinez
Defendant: AutoZone, Inc. and DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv02339
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (npo)
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 Answer of Defendant AutoZone, Inc. to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint filed by Defendant AutoZone, Inc. re: Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Miscellaneous Document #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Spada, Kristen)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant AutoZone, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 Proof of Service re Standing Order served on November 24, 2020. (Spada, Kristen)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
November 11, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant AutoZone, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Miscellaneous Document #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on November 11, 2020. (Spada, Kristen)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
November 9, 2020 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant AutoZone, Inc. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa)
November 9, 2020 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS executed by Plaintiff Cesar Martinez, upon Defendant AutoZone, Inc. served on 10/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
November 9, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants AutoZone, Inc., Does., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Cesar Martinez. (filed in state court 8/25/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AutoZone, Inc. re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Spada, Kristen)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant AutoZone, Inc. (Spada, Kristen)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant AutoZone, Inc.. (Spada, Kristen)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS2017243 Receipt No: ACACDC-28924261 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant AutoZone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Notices, #5 Declaration) (Attorney Kristen E Spada added to party AutoZone, Inc.(pty:dft))(Spada, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cesar Martinez v. AutoZone, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Martinez
Represented By: Bryan Owens Sahagun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen E Spada
Represented By: Jerry J Chang
Represented By: Steven G Gatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?