UHS-Corona, Inc. et al v. Optum Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc. doing business as Inland Valley Medical Center, a Campus of Southwest Healthcare System, Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc. doing business as Temecula Valley Hospital, UHS-Corona, Inc. doing business as Corona Regional Medical Center and Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc. doing business as Rancho Springs Medical Center, a Campus of Southwest Healthcare System
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive., Primecare of Riverside, Inc., Primecare of Redlands, Inc., Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc., Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc., Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc., Primecare of Temecula, Inc., Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc., PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc., Primecare of Corona, Inc., Primecare of Sun City, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc., Valley Physicians Network, Inc., Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc., North American Medical Management California, Inc., Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc., Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc., Primecare Medical Network, Inc., Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc. doing business as Coachella Valley Physicians, Does 1 through 50, inclusive and Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc. doing business as Primary Care Associates Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv02556
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., (Pitt, Damon)
January 25, 2021 Filing 18 SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #11 filed by Plaintiffs Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/5/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr..(Blanche, Caitlin)
January 25, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #16 filed by Plaintiffs Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc.. (Blanche, Caitlin)
January 25, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by PLAINTIFF Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/5/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF CAITLIN C. BLANCHE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND) (Blanche, Caitlin)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Upon Stipulation #14 , it is hereby Ordered that Plaintiffs shall file their Motion to Remand no later than 1/25/2021. The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand shall be set for 3/5/2021 at 8:30 AM, or on a date thereafter that is convenient for the Court. In the event that the Court enters an Order denying Plaintiffs Motion to Remand on or before 3/15/2021, Defendants shall file their responsive pleading no later than 3/29/2021 and the hearing shall be set for 4/30/2021, at 8:30 AM, or on a date thereafter that is convenient for the Court. See document for further details. (gk)
December 31, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading And Set Briefing Schedule On Motion To Remand filed by Defendants Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc., Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc., North American Medical Management California, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc., PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc., Primecare Medical Network, Inc., Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc., Primecare of Corona, Inc., Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc., Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc., Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc., Primecare of Redlands, Inc., Primecare of Riverside, Inc., Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc., Primecare of Sun City, Inc., Primecare of Temecula, Inc., Valley Physicians Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation To Extend Defendants Time To File Responsive Pleading And Set Briefing Schedule On Motion To Remand)(Wood, Nathanial)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr)
December 18, 2020 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit B To Defendants Notice Of Removal Of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1442(a)(1), 1446 (Plaintiffs Complaint With Exhibit A To The Complaint) re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #11 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendants Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc., Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc., North American Medical Management California, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc., PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc., Primecare Medical Network, Inc., Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc., Primecare of Corona, Inc., Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc., Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc., Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc., Primecare of Redlands, Inc., Primecare of Riverside, Inc., Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc., Primecare of Sun City, Inc., Primecare of Temecula, Inc., Valley Physicians Network, Inc..(Wood, Nathanial)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND EXHIBIT A TO THE COMPLAINT #4 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. See document for specifics. (gk)
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Primecare Medical Network, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Primecare of Temecula, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Primecare of Sun City, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Primecare of Redlands, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; North American Medical Management California, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Primecare of Corona, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Valley Physicians Network, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Primecare of Riverside, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021; Optum Services, Inc. answer now due 1/19/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendants Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc.; Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc.; Primecare Medical Network, Inc.; Primecare of Temecula, Inc.; PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc.; Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc.; Primecare of Sun City, Inc.; Primecare of Redlands, Inc.; North American Medical Management California, Inc.; Primecare of Corona, Inc.; Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc.; Valley Physicians Network, Inc.; Primecare of Riverside, Inc.; Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc.; Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc.; Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc.; Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc.; Optum Services, Inc..(Wood, Nathanial)
December 11, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc., Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc., North American Medical Management California, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc., PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc., Primecare Medical Network, Inc., Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc., Primecare of Corona, Inc., Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc., Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc., Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc., Primecare of Redlands, Inc., Primecare of Riverside, Inc., Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc., Primecare of Sun City, Inc., Primecare of Temecula, Inc., Valley Physicians Network, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,, #3 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents),,,, #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),, #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,, #5 , APPLICATION to file document Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint And Exhibit A To The Complaint under seal #4 served on December 11, 2020. (Wood, Nathanial)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-02556 SB (SPx). (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Valley Physicians Network, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Primecare of Temecula, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Primecare of Sun City, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Primecare of Redlands, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Primecare of Corona, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Primecare Medical Network, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Optum Services, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant North American Medical Management California, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steve Dorfman, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc., upon Defendant Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc. served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service by leaivng with Peter Cayetano, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/18/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
December 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc., North American Medical Management California, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc., PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc., Primecare Medical Network, Inc., Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc., Primecare of Corona, Inc., Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc., Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc., Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc., Primecare of Redlands, Inc., Primecare of Riverside, Inc., Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc., Primecare of Sun City, Inc., Primecare of Temecula, Inc., Valley Physicians Network, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc., UHS-Corona, Inc., Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc. Filed in State Court on 10/30/2020 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 . (car)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc., Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc., North American Medical Management California, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc., PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc., Primecare Medical Network, Inc., Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc., Primecare of Corona, Inc., Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc., Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc., Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc., Primecare of Redlands, Inc., Primecare of Riverside, Inc., Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc., Primecare of Sun City, Inc., Primecare of Temecula, Inc., Valley Physicians Network, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),, #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,, #5 , APPLICATION to file document Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint And Exhibit A To The Complaint under seal #4 served on December 10, 2020. (Wood, Nathanial)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint And Exhibit A To The Complaint under seal #4 filed by Defendants Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc., Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc., North American Medical Management California, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc., PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc., Primecare Medical Network, Inc., Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc., Primecare of Corona, Inc., Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc., Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc., Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc., Primecare of Redlands, Inc., Primecare of Riverside, Inc., Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc., Primecare of Sun City, Inc., Primecare of Temecula, Inc., Valley Physicians Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Phillips Declaration In Support To File Application Under Seal, #2 Unredacted Document Ex B to Defendants Optum Services, Inc., et al.s Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1442(a)(1), 1446)(Wood, Nathanial)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION to file document Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint And Exhibit A To The Complaint under seal filed by Defendants Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc., Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc., North American Medical Management California, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc., PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc., Primecare Medical Network, Inc., Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc., Primecare of Corona, Inc., Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc., Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc., Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc., Primecare of Redlands, Inc., Primecare of Riverside, Inc., Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc., Primecare of Sun City, Inc., Primecare of Temecula, Inc., Valley Physicians Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Application For Leave To File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint And Exhibit A To The Complaint, #2 Redacted Document Ex B To Defendants Optum Services, Inc., et al.s Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1442(a)(1), 1446)(Wood, Nathanial)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc., Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc., North American Medical Management California, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc., PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc., Primecare Medical Network, Inc., Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc., Primecare of Corona, Inc., Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc., Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc., Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc., Primecare of Redlands, Inc., Primecare of Riverside, Inc., Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc., Primecare of Sun City, Inc., Primecare of Temecula, Inc., Valley Physicians Network, Inc., identifying Optum, Inc.; NAMM Holdings, Inc.; UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Wood, Nathanial)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc., Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc., North American Medical Management California, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc., PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc., Primecare Medical Network, Inc., Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc., Primecare of Corona, Inc., Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc., Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc., Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc., Primecare of Redlands, Inc., Primecare of Riverside, Inc., Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc., Primecare of Sun City, Inc., Primecare of Temecula, Inc., Valley Physicians Network, Inc.. (Wood, Nathanial)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC2004406 Receipt No: ACACDC-29467371 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc., Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc., Primecare Medical Network, Inc., Primecare of Temecula, Inc., PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc., Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc., Primecare of Sun City, Inc., Primecare of Redlands, Inc., North American Medical Management California, Inc., Primecare of Corona, Inc., Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc., Valley Physicians Network, Inc., Primecare of Riverside, Inc., Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc., Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc., Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc., Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc., Optum Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Jamie Phillips In Support Of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., et al.s Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - D In Support Of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., et al.s Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit E In Support Of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., et al.s Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit F - I In Support Of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., et al.s Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit J - L In Support Of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., et al.s Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit M - P In Support Of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., et al.s Notice of Removal) (Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party North American Medical Management California, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Optum Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Primecare Medical Network, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Primecare of Corona, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Primecare of Redlands, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Primecare of Riverside, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Primecare of Sun City, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Primecare of Temecula, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial John Wood added to party Valley Physicians Network, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wood, Nathanial)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UHS-Corona, Inc. et al v. Optum Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare of Riverside, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare of Redlands, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare of Inland Valley, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare of San Bernardino, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare of Temecula, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare of Citrus Valley, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimeCare Medical Group of Chino Valley, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare of Corona, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare of Sun City, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare of Hemet Valley, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Physicians Network, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Medical Management California, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare of Moreno Valley, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Physicians Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare Medical Network, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coachella Valley Physicians of Primecare, Inc. doing business as Coachella Valley Physicians
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Care Associated Medical Group, Inc. doing business as Primary Care Associates Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nathanial John Wood
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS-Corona, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc. doing business as Inland Valley Medical Center, a Campus of Southwest Healthcare System
Represented By: Damon M Pitt
Represented By: Caitlin Comstock Blanche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temecula Valley Hospital, Inc. doing business as Temecula Valley Hospital
Represented By: Damon M Pitt
Represented By: Caitlin Comstock Blanche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UHS-Corona, Inc. doing business as Corona Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Damon M Pitt
Represented By: Caitlin Comstock Blanche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Health Services of Rancho Springs, Inc. doing business as Rancho Springs Medical Center, a Campus of Southwest Healthcare System
Represented By: Damon M Pitt
Represented By: Caitlin Comstock Blanche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?