Anton International, Inc. v. Chunhong Zhang et al
Plaintiff: ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC. and Anton International, Inc.
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive and CHUNHONG ZHANG
Case Number: 5:2021cv00120
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. #11 ], is ordered CONTINUED from March 26, 2021 to April 9, 2021, at 9:00 a.m., via video conference. To obtain the video conference link for the scheduled hearing, the parties are directed to Judge Holcomb's Procedures and Schedules page on the Court's website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-w-holcomb. Please follow the instructions listed under "Zoom Webinar Hearings." IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 12, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #11 filed by Defendant Chunhong Zhang. (Doniger, Stephen)
March 5, 2021 Filing 15 OBJECTION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #11 filed by Plaintiff Anton International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Objections to Declaration of Chunhong Zhang and Defendants Request for Judicial Notice)(Scroggins, Thad)
March 5, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #11 filed by Plaintiff Anton International, Inc.. (Scroggins, Thad)
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen M. Doniger counsel for Defendant Chunhong Zhang. Adding David Shein as counsel of record for Chunhong Zhang for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Chunhong Zhang. (Doniger, Stephen)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #11 filed by Defendant Chunhong Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Doniger, Stephen)
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Chunhong Zhang. Motion set for hearing on 3/26/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chunhong Zhang, #2 Exhibit 1 to Zhang DL, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Chunhong Zhang(pty:dft)) (Doniger, Stephen)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Anton International, Inc.. (Scroggins, Thad)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 as to Defendant Chunhong Zhang. (et)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC., (Scroggins, Thad)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Plaintiff ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Scroggins, Thad)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (402 paid on 01/22/2021, receipt number 30185367), filed by Plaintiff ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Thad Marvin Scroggins added to party ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC.(pty:pla))(Scroggins, Thad)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Scroggins, Thad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anton International, Inc. v. Chunhong Zhang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC.
Represented By: Thad Marvin Scroggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton International, Inc.
Represented By: Thad Marvin Scroggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUNHONG ZHANG
Represented By: Stephen M. Doniger
Represented By: David Shein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?