Sandra Oceguera et al v. Baby Trend, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mohammad Wafai and Sandra Oceguera
Defendant: Baby Trend, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00398
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Baby Trend, Inc. answer now due 5/7/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Baby Trend, Inc..(Attorney Randolph Thomas Moore added to party Baby Trend, Inc.(pty:dft))(Moore, Randolph)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Graifman, Gary S. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of SANDRA OCEGUERA and MOHAMMAD WAFAI, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated., designating Rudd, Christopher L. as local counsel. (yl)
April 5, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai, upon Defendant Baby Trend, Inc. served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Erica Salcedo, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Mason, Gary)
April 3, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary S. Graifman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31041407) filed by plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing--NY, #2 Certificate of Standing--NJ, #3 Proposed Order) (Rudd, Christopher)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: GRANTING #15 Non-Resident Attorney Melissa R. Emert APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera and Mohammad Wafai, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, designating Christopher L. Rudd as local counsel. (shb)
March 16, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa R. Emert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30929665) filed by plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing--NY, #2 Proposed Order) (Rudd, Christopher)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Gary E Mason APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai, designating Christopher L Rudd as local counsel. (jp)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary E. Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30874732) filed by plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing--DC, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-MD, #3 Certificate of Standing--NY, #4 Proposed Order) (Rudd, Christopher)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of other firm name or address information by Christopher L. Rudd attorney for Plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai. Changing fax number. Filed by Plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai. (Rudd, Christopher)
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gary S Graifman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Melissa R Emert. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gary E Mason. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Baby Trend, Inc. (esa)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai. (Rudd, Christopher)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai, (Rudd, Christopher)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai. (Rudd, Christopher)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30862176 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiffs Sandra Oceguera, Mohammad Wafai. (Attorney Christopher L. Rudd added to party Sandra Oceguera(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Rudd added to party Mohammad Wafai(pty:pla))(Rudd, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandra Oceguera et al v. Baby Trend, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Wafai
Represented By: Christopher L. Rudd
Represented By: Danielle L. Perry
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Christopher L Rudd
Represented By: Melissa R Emert
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Oceguera
Represented By: Christopher L. Rudd
Represented By: Danielle L. Perry
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Christopher L Rudd
Represented By: Melissa R Emert
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baby Trend, Inc.
Represented By: Randolph Thomas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?