Jonathan Lopez v. Capstone Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lopez
Defendant: McLane Company, Inc., DOES 1 through 20, inclusive and Capstone Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00416
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT MCLANE COMPANY, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE #22 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (lom)
April 13, 2021 Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant McLane Company, Inc. filed by Defendants McLane Company, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC.(May, Eric)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer A. Riley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Capstone Logistics, LLC and McLane Company, Inc. Defendant, designating Eric W. May as local counsel. (twdb)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Capstone Logistics, LLC and McLane Company, Inc. Defendant, designating Eric W. May as local counsel. (twdb)
March 19, 2021 Filing 19 REFUND OF $500.00 made payable on 03/19/2021 to Eric May for payment made on 03/16/2021 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer A. Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-309 #18 . (rdj)
March 17, 2021 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer A. Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-30925069) #17 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30924543) #16 filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc.. (May, Eric)
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer A. Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-30925069) filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing-NY, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-IL, #3 Proposed Order) (May, Eric)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30924543) filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing-NY, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-IL, #3 Proposed Order) (May, Eric)
March 15, 2021 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to McLane Company, Inc. answer now due 4/14/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC.(May, Eric)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
March 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d) filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc.. (May, Eric)
March 10, 2021 Filing 12 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, (Geshgian, Samvel)
March 10, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Samvel Geshgian counsel for Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Adding Samvel Geshgian as counsel of record for Jonathan Lopez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Attorney Samvel Geshgian added to party Jonathan Lopez(pty:pla))(Geshgian, Samvel)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer A Riley. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gerald L Maatman, Jr. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car)
March 8, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc. Submitted with Exhibit 5 to Notice of Removal #1 . (Attorney Justin T Curley added to party Capstone Logistics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Justin T Curley added to party McLane Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(car)
March 8, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, Does 1-20, inclusive, McLane Company, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Filed in State Court on 12/7/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc., identifying 1. Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. 2. Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. 3. Capstone Logistics Acquisition, Inc. owns 100% of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. 4. Chubb North America, insurance carrier for Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. 5. Defendant McLane Company, Inc., a wholly-owned subsidiary of Berkshire Hathaway Inc. 6. Berkshire Hathaway Inc., a publicly-traded company on the New York Stock Exchange. (May, Eric)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Kevin J. Koch re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc.. (May, Eric)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Eric W. May re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc.. (May, Eric)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Cindy Davis re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc.. (May, Eric)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC, McLane Company, Inc.. (May, Eric)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2028348 Receipt No: ACACDC-30876788 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants McLane Company, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -5 to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Eric W May added to party Capstone Logistics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eric W May added to party McLane Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(May, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jonathan Lopez v. Capstone Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLane Company, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W May
Represented By: Justin T Curley
Represented By: Jennifer A Riley
Represented By: Gerald L Maatman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstone Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Eric W May
Represented By: Justin T Curley
Represented By: Jennifer A Riley
Represented By: Gerald L Maatman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lopez
Represented By: Ramin R Younessi
Represented By: Samvel Geshgian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?