Jose Hernandez Solis v. The Merchant of Tennis, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Hernandez Solis
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 and The Merchant of Tennis, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00459
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Merchant of Tennis, Inc., (Purcell, John)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #11 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Counsel is ordered to file a Notice of Interested Parties forthwith by no later than APRIL 28, 2021. (yl)
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Merchant of Tennis, Inc..(Attorney John S Purcell added to party The Merchant of Tennis, Inc.(pty:dft))(Purcell, John)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis, upon Defendant The Merchant of Tennis, Inc. served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeff Green, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Standing Order)(Haines, Paul)
March 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Merchant of Tennis, Inc. (lh)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis, (Haines, Paul)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis. (Haines, Paul)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis. (Haines, Paul)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30920936 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Attorney Paul Keith Haines added to party Jose Hernandez Solis(pty:pla))(Haines, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose Hernandez Solis v. The Merchant of Tennis, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Merchant of Tennis, Inc.
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Hernandez Solis
Represented By: Paul Keith Haines
Represented By: Joseph R Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?