County of San Bernardino v. United Health Group Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: County of San Bernardino
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., Mathis Bros., Oklahoma City, LLC, Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Does 1-11, inclusive, Las Vegas Sands Corp., Optum Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and UMR, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00595
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date for UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, Optum Services, Inc., and United Medical Resources, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. Nos. #15 , #18 ). ( Motion hearing continued to 8/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.) (twdb)
May 28, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Continue, #18 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Senelick, Devin)
May 28, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Continue, #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order attached. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
May 27, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date for Unitedhealth Group's Motion to Dismiss from June 28, 2021 to August 16, 2021 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Joinder to Motion to Dismiss #15 filed by Plaintiff County of San Bernardino.(Attorney Devin Michael Senelick added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:pla))(Senelick, Devin)
May 24, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Joinder to Motion to Dismiss #15 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Platt, Daniel)
May 24, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss #14 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
May 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Joinder to Motion to Dismiss filed by defendants Optum Services, Inc., UMR, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Platt, Daniel)
May 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Def. Mathis Bros. and/or Preempted Causes filed by Defendant Mathis Bros., Oklahoma City, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl Re: LR 7-3) (Wells, Tracy)
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Las Vegas Sands Corp.. (Jaeger, Michael)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #10 . FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, it is so ordered that an extension to respond to the Complaint is granted until May 21, 2021 as to all Defendants. (twdb)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Defendant Mathis Bros., Oklahoma City, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wells, Tracy)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #8 . Defendant Las Vegas Sands Corp. answer due 4/23/2021; Mathis Bros., Oklahoma City, LLC answer due 4/23/2021; Optum Services, Inc. answer due 4/23/2021; UMR, Inc. answer due 4/23/2021; United HealthCare Services, Inc. answer due 4/23/2021; United Health Group Incorporated answer due 4/23/2021; United healthcare Insurance Company answer due 4/23/2021. (twdb)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Mathis Bros., Oklahoma City, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wells, Tracy)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. (car)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Consent to Join in Removal filed by Defendant Las Vegas Sands Corp.. (Jaeger, Michael)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UnitedHealth Group, Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company, identifying UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Attorney Daniel A Platt added to party UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Platt added to party UnitedHealth Group(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel A Platt added to party Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Platt, Daniel)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE Consent to Join in Removal filed by defendants UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UnitedHealth Group, Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company. (Platt, Daniel)
April 2, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, inclusive, Las Vegas Sands Corp., Mathis Bros., Oklahoma City, LLC, Optum Services, Inc., UMR, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff County of San Bernardino. Filed in State Court on 1/20/2021 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 2, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff County of San Bernardino, upon Defendant Mathis Bros., Oklahoma City, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by James C Prince, Counsel for Defendant. Submitted with Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2102590 Receipt No: ACACDC-31041158 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Mathis Bros., Oklahoma City, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Declarations, #3 Supplement Cert of Int Parties/Corp Decl, #4 Supplement Proof of Service) (Attorney Tracy L Wells added to party Mathis Bros., Oklahoma City, LLC(pty:dft))(Wells, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of San Bernardino v. United Health Group Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Jong-min Choi
Represented By: Daniel A Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathis Bros., Oklahoma City, LLC
Represented By: Tracy L Wells
Represented By: Susan L Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Jong-min Choi
Represented By: Daniel A Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-11, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Sands Corp.
Represented By: Michael Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jong-min Choi
Represented By: Daniel A Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Jong-min Choi
Represented By: Daniel A Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Represented By: Jong-min Choi
Represented By: Daniel A Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of San Bernardino
Represented By: Devin Michael Senelick
Represented By: Bridget A Gordon
Represented By: Katherine Markowski Dru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?