Gabriela Valdiviezo v. Laboratory Corporation of America et al
Plaintiff: Gabriela Valdiviezo
Defendant: Baschar, Jasmin, DOES 1-100, inclusive, Cynthia Nelson, Laboratory Corporation of America, LeNesha Glenn and Vaschar Moore
Case Number: 5:2021cv00934
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT VASCHAR MOORE'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT TO AUGUST 10, 2021 #21 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Defendant Vaschar Moore's deadline to file a responsive pleading in this matter is continued from July 27, 2021 to August 10, 2021. (et)
July 23, 2021 Filing 22 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The HEARING on the MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #11 , and MOTION to Dismiss CERTAIN CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #7 is CONTINUED from 7/26/2021 to 8/9/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDEREDTHERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 23, 2021 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Vaschar Moore answer now due 8/10/2021, filed by Defendant Vaschar Moore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Joint Stipulation)(Attorney Vanuhi Karapetian added to party Vaschar Moore(pty:dft))(Karapetian, Vanuhi)
July 12, 2021 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gabriela Valdiviezo, upon Defendant Baschar served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Zelman, Michael)
July 12, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #11 filed by Plaintiff Gabriela Valdiviezo. (Zelman, Michael)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss #7 set for hearing on July 8, 2021 is hereby CONTINUED to July 26, 2021 at 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 2, 2021 Filing 17 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #11 filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America. (Karapetian, Vanuhi)
June 30, 2021 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), as to Defendant Baschar. (et)
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), as to Defendant Jasmin. (et)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
June 24, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CERTAIN CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #7 filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America. (Meggs, Connor)
June 24, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Gabriela Valdiviezo. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons - Vaschar Moore)(Zelman, Michael)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Gabriela Valdiviezo. Motion set for hearing on 7/26/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taylor M. Prainito in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion) (Zelman, Michael)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CERTAIN CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #7 filed by Plaintiff Gabriela Valdiviezo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taylor M. Prainito in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Proposed Order)(Zelman, Michael)
June 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CERTAIN CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): The Hearing should be set before the District Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:21-cv-00934 JGB (SHKx). (esa)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CERTAIN CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Karapetian, Vanuhi)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on June 3, 2021. (Karapetian, Vanuhi)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (dsb)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap)
June 1, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Baschar, Does 1-100, inclusive, LeNesha Glenn, Jasmin, Laboratory Corporation of America, Cynthia Nelson. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Gabriela Valdiviezo. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/20/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 Notice & CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America, identifying Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Karapetian, Vanuhi)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America. (Karapetian, Vanuhi)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Riverside, case number CVRI2101836 Receipt No: ACACDC-31390206 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Department Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Certificate of Counsel, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Case Management Conference, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Document Quality, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Return Document, #9 Memorandum) (Attorney Vanuhi Karapetian added to party Laboratory Corporation of America(pty:dft))(Karapetian, Vanuhi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriela Valdiviezo v. Laboratory Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baschar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America
Represented By: Vanuhi Karapetian
Represented By: Christopher J Kondon
Represented By: Connor James Meggs
Represented By: Saman M Rejali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeNesha Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaschar Moore
Represented By: Vanuhi Karapetian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriela Valdiviezo
Represented By: Taylor Marie Prainito
Represented By: Michael Alan Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?