Sheila Brass et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sheila Brass and Gerald Johnson
Defendant: FCA US, LLC, Jeep Chrysler Dodge Ram Fiat of Ontario and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2021cv01190
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2022 Filing 30 Receipt of remand letter (twdb)
July 26, 2022 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson. Kareem Shereef Aref is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Sheila Brass and Gerald Johnson. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 14, 2022 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Sheila Brass and Gerald Johnson. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 3, 2022 Filing 27 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. (twdb)
March 3, 2022 Filing 26 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion for Remand (Dkt. No. 19); and (2) VACATING the March 7, 2022 Hearing #19 . Case Remanded to Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, San Bernardino Justice Center, CIVSB 2103181. The request for remote appearance (Dkt. No. 25) is DENIED as MOOT #25 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb)
March 2, 2022 Filing 25 REQUEST for Leave of Karin Kuemerle to Appear for Remote Appearance filed by Plaintiffs Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson. Request set for hearing on 3/7/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiffs Sheila Brass and Gerald Johnson's Request for Remote Appearance at Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Hearing on March 7, 2022 via Zoom) (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Via Telephone or Zoom for Defendant FCA US, LLC. Counsel for FCA US may appear via Telephone or Zoom at the hearing on March 7, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. (twdb)
February 25, 2022 Filing 23 REQUEST for Leave of Christopher M. Fisher to Appear for Via telephonic or Zoom Request to Appear at Motion to Remand via telephonic or zoom filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. Request set for hearing on 3/7/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shepardson, Scott)
February 18, 2022 Filing 22 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Riverside #19 filed by Plaintiffs Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson. (Law, Daniel)
February 14, 2022 Filing 21 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Riverside #19 filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott S. Shepardson)(Shepardson, Scott)
February 3, 2022 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Riverside #19 filed by Plaintiffs Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson. (Dolin, Tionna)
February 3, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Riverside filed by Plaintiffs' Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson. Motion set for hearing on 3/7/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand) (Dolin, Tionna)
February 1, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiffs Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Sheila Brass(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Gerald Johnson(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 28, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Sheila Brass. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Sheila Brass. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 2/13/2023. (npo)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2022. Discovery cut-off 1/9/2023. Motions cut-off 4/3/2023. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 2/13/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 5/30/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (npo)
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kareem Shereef Aref on behalf of Plaintiffs Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson (Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Sheila Brass(pty:pla), Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Gerald Johnson(pty:pla))(Aref, Kareem)
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 The Court hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2021. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine J Haw on behalf of Plaintiffs Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Sheila Brass(pty:pla), Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Gerald Johnson(pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Schedule Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet)(Law, Daniel)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Plaintiffs SHEILA BRASS and GERALD JOHNSON for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff SHEILA BRASS and GERALD JOHNSON. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Sheila Brass(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Gerald Johnson(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (npo)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on July 16, 2021. (Shepardson, Scott)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh)
July 16, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, FCA US, LLC, Jeep Chrysler Dodge Ram Fiat of Ontario. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/18/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
July 16, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/13/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
July 16, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Sheila Brass, Gerald Johnson pursuant to Cal. Rules of Court, rules 3.760 and 3.770 as to Jeep Chrysler Dodge Ram Fiat of Ontario. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Shepardson, Scott)
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Shepardson, Scott)
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2103181 Receipt No: ACACDC-31645072 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott S. Shepardson, #2 Declaration of Rochelle Smith, #3 Exhibit A to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #4 Exhibit B to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #5 Exhibit C to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #6 Exhibit D to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #7 Exhibit E to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #8 Exhibit F to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #9 Exhibit G to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #10 Exhibit H to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #11 Exhibit I to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #12 Exhibit J to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #13 Exhibit K to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #14 Exhibit L to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #15 Exhibit M to Decl of Rochelle Smith, #16 Exhibit N to Decl of Rochelle Smith) (Attorney Scott Steven Shepardson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Shepardson, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheila Brass et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Brass
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Kareem Shereef Aref
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Johnson
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Kareem Shereef Aref
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Scott Steven Shepardson
Represented By: Rochelle Lillian Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeep Chrysler Dodge Ram Fiat of Ontario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?