DP Etiwanda, LLC v. Simsmetal USA Corp et al
Plaintiff: DP Etiwanda, LLC
Defendant: Simsmetal USA Corp, SA Recycling, Ameron International, Inc., TAMCO, Does 1-20 inclusive and Does 1-20, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2021cv01238
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TAMCO answer now due 10/8/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant TAMCO.(Clark, David)
September 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Brandon Clark on behalf of Defendant TAMCO (Attorney David Brandon Clark added to party TAMCO(pty:dft))(Clark, David)
September 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff DP Etiwanda, LLC, upon Defendant SA Recycling acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by R. Gaylord Smith, Counsel for SA Recycling. (Hughes, Perry)
September 14, 2021 Filing 15 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ameron International, Inc., (McLean, Michael)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
September 8, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Answer to Plaintiff DP Etiwanda LLC's Complaint filed by Defendant Ameron International, Inc..(Attorney Michael Donald McLean added to party Ameron International, Inc.(pty:dft))(McLean, Michael)
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 *PROOF OF SERVICES OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT* Filed as PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff DP Etiwanda, LLC, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on 8/18/2021. (Moses, Cathy) Modified on 8/20/2021 (et).
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 *PROOF OF SERVICES OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT* Filed as PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff DP Etiwanda, LLC, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on 8/18/2021. (Moses, Cathy) Modified on 8/20/2021 (et).
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff DP Etiwanda, LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on 8/18/2021. (Moses, Cathy)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Ameron International, Inc., SA Recycling, Simsmetal USA Corp, TAMCO. (esa)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff DP Etiwanda, LLC. (Moses, Cathy)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DP Etiwanda, LLC, identifying 1. DP Etiwanda, LLC, Plaintiff 2. Dedeaux Properties, LLC, Managing Member of DP Etiwanda, LLC 3. Brett Dedeaux, Member of Dedeaux Properties, LLC 4. Teri Dedeaux, Member of Dedeaux Properties, LLC 5. Justin Dedeaux, Member of Dedeaux Properties, LLC. (Moses, Cathy)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff DP Etiwanda, LLC. (Moses, Cathy)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31691111 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff DP Etiwanda, LLC. (Attorney Cathy Moses added to party DP Etiwanda, LLC(pty:pla))(Moses, Cathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DP Etiwanda, LLC v. Simsmetal USA Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DP Etiwanda, LLC
Represented By: Cathy Moses
Represented By: Perry S. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simsmetal USA Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA Recycling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameron International, Inc.
Represented By: Jaclyn Carney
Represented By: Michael Joseph Fabrega
Represented By: Michael Donald McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMCO
Represented By: David Brandon Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?