K2 Aviation, LLC v. Alliance International Aviation, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: K2 Aviation, LLC
Defendant: Alliance International Aviation, LLC and Hickslanders, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Alliance International Aviation
Case Number: 5:2021cv01258
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff K2 Aviation, LLC, re Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Summons Request #2 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 served on September 3, 2021. (O'Brien, Matthew)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Leach APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of K2 Aviation, LLC Plaintiff, designating Ilana G. Zelener as local counsel. (twdb)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney William R. Meyer APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of K2 Aviation, LLC Plaintiff, designating Ilana G. Zelener as local counsel. (twdb)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 29, 2021 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Writ of Possession filed by Plaintiff K2 Aviation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zelener, #2 Declaration of Knop, #3 Proposed Order) (Zelener, Ilana)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William R. Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff K2 Aviation, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31710588) #11 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Leach to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff K2 Aviation, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31710661) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Leach to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff K2 Aviation, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31710661) filed by Plaintiff K2 Aviation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Zelener, Ilana)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William R. Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff K2 Aviation, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31710588) filed by Plaintiff K2 Aviation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Zelener, Ilana)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Leach. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William Meyer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Alliance International Aviation, LLC, Hickslanders, LLC. (esa)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff K2 Aviation, LLC, (Zelener, Ilana)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff K2 Aviation, LLC. (Zelener, Ilana)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff K2 Aviation, LLC. (Zelener, Ilana)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31706197 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff K2 Aviation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Attorney Ilana G. Zelener added to party K2 Aviation, LLC(pty:pla))(Zelener, Ilana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K2 Aviation, LLC v. Alliance International Aviation, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K2 Aviation, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Sean O'Brien
Represented By: Ilana G. Zelener
Represented By: Christopher Leach
Represented By: William R. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance International Aviation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hickslanders, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Alliance International Aviation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?