Sandra J. Williams et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Williams and Roscoe T. Williams
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Sunrise Ford and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2021cv01346
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
2 Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Filing 58 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $0.00 in favor of Plaintiffs, Sandra and Roscoe Williams and against Defendants, Ford Motor Company. Refer to document #57 #34 (rmo)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES #35 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Court GRANTS in part Plaintiffs' motion and awards Plaintiffs $54,289.55 in reasonable attorneys' fees. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' joint stipulation regarding Plaintiffs' costs and expenses and awards Plaintiffs $4,374.92 in costs and expenses. Defendant is ORDERED to pay reasonable fees in the amount of $58,664.47, inclusive of attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. (iv)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING THE MOTION (DKT.NO. #35 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: The Court has considered the matter raised with respect to Plaintiffs Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Motion noticed for hearing on February 1, 2023, has been taken under submission and off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 18, 2023 Filing 55 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #35 filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Rabieian, Debora)
January 18, 2023 Filing 54 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Debora Rabieian counsel for Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. Adding Breita Linnell as counsel of record for SANDRA J. WILLIAMS and ROSCOE T. WILLIAMS for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs SANDRA J. WILLIAMS and ROSCOE T. WILLIAMS. (Rabieian, Debora)
January 11, 2023 Filing 53 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #35 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Jun, Patricia)
January 11, 2023 Filing 52 Joint STIPULATION for Costs against Ford Motor Company filed by Plaintiff Roscoe T. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabieian, Debora)
December 9, 2022 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Debora Rabieian IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO TAX COSTS filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Rabieian, Debora)
December 9, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. correcting APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant Ford Motor Company #34 (Rabieian, Debora)
December 9, 2022 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Payam Shahian in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #35 CORRECTED filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit)(Rabieian, Debora)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION #46 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Court continues the filing deadline of Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses from December 2, 2022 to December 9, 2022. (iv)
December 5, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation for Order, #46 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Rabieian, Debora)
December 5, 2022 Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION for Order TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION filed by plaintiff Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION)(Rabieian, Debora)
December 5, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Motion, #39 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabieian, Debora)
December 5, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Continue, #32 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabieian, Debora)
December 5, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Motion for Attorney Fees #35 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
December 5, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation #32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order submitted does not conform with the Courts Order. Filer must resubmit the Proposed Order in accordance with the Courts Procedures. Refer to Judges Procedures and Schedules Proposed Order Sample. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
December 2, 2022 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Tionna Dolin re Stipulation to Continue, #32 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 2, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #35 filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. Motion set for hearing on 2/1/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (Rabieian, Debora)
December 1, 2022 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Payam Shahian in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #35 filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-32)(Rabieian, Debora)
December 1, 2022 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Breita Linnell in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #35 filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Rabieian, Debora)
December 1, 2022 Filing 36 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #35 filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Rabieian, Debora)
December 1, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. Motion set for hearing on 2/1/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (Rabieian, Debora)
December 1, 2022 Filing 34 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Williams, Roscoe T. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Debora Rabieian) (Rabieian, Debora)
December 1, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Debora Rabieian on behalf of Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams (Attorney Debora Rabieian added to party Roscoe T. Williams(pty:pla), Attorney Debora Rabieian added to party Sandra J. Williams(pty:pla))(Rabieian, Debora)
December 1, 2022 Filing 32 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses and Jurisdiction from December 2, 2022 to December 9, 2022 filed by plaintiff Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES and JURISDICTION)(Dolin, Tionna)
November 17, 2022 Filing 31 JUDGMENT by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Judgment is hereby entered for Plaintiffs and against Defendant according to the terms set forth in the Offer of Judgment. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
November 16, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Request #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING THE MOTION (DKT.NO. #24 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Motion noticed for hearing on November 16, 2022, has been taken under submission and off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 10, 2022 Filing 28 REQUEST for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Dolin, Tionna)
September 7, 2022 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #24 filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Law, Daniel)
September 7, 2022 Filing 26 Opposition In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #24 filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Law, Daniel)
September 7, 2022 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Sandra J. Williams and Roscoe T. Williams for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Williams and Roscoe T. Williams. (Law, Daniel)
September 1, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. Jun, #2 Exhibit A to Decl. of P. Jun, #3 Exhibit B to Decl. of P. Jun, #4 Exhibit C to Decl. of P. Jun, #5 Exhibit D to Decl. of P. Jun, #6 Exhibit E to Decl. of P. Jun, #7 Proposed Order) (Jun, Patricia)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT MOTION #22 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: The Court hereby orders that Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is stricken for failure to comply with the Local Rules and the Courts Procedures and Schedules as indicated: Hearing information untimely.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 31, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to All Causes of Action filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. Jun, #2 Exhibit A to Decl. of P. Jun, #3 Exhibit B to Decl. of P. Jun, #4 Exhibit C to Decl. of P. Jun, #5 Exhibit D to Decl. of P. Jun, #6 Exhibit E to Decl. of P. Jun, #7 Proposed Order) (Jun, Patricia)
August 5, 2022 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. Adding Joy De Leon as counsel of record for Sandra J. Williams and Roscoe T. Williams for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Sandra J. Williams and Roscoe T. Williams. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 3, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. Adding Joy De Leon as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Sandra J. Williams and Roscoe T. Williams. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 27, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi counsel for Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. Adding Rabiya Tirmizi as counsel of record for Roscoe T. Williams and Sandra J. Williams for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams and Sandra J. Williams. (Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Roscoe T. Williams(pty:pla), Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Sandra J. Williams(pty:pla))(Tirmizi, Rabiya)
July 7, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Williams and Roscoe T. Williams. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-128) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Garnett, Sherilyn Peace, this case is transferred from Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha to the calendar of Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-01346-SPG-SHKx. (et)
April 26, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Sandra J. Williams and Roscoe T. Williams for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs' Sandra J. Williams and Roscoe T. Williams. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Roscoe T. Williams(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Sandra J. Williams(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
February 8, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Roscoe T. Williams(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Sandra J. Williams(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 29, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, TRIAL REQUIREMENTS, AND CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2023 03:00 PM ; Jury Trial set for 2/14/2023 08:30 AM ; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 1/27/2023 at 03:00 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 12/23/2022. (tf)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference currently set for hearing on December 17, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. is hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 3, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams.. (Law, Daniel)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiffs Roscoe T. Williams, Sandra J. Williams (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Roscoe T. Williams(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Sandra J. Williams(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (jre)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (vv)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-01346 FLA (SHKx). (car)
August 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ford Motor Company, Sunrise Ford. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Williams, Roscoe T. Williams. Filed in State Court on 3/29/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Sandra J. Williams, Roscoe T. Williams pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Sunrise Ford Without prejudice. Filed in State Court on 7/13/2021 Submitted with Attachment 5 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Filed in State Court on 7/13/2021 Submitted with Attachment 9 to Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney David M Keithly added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(car)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Mortenson, Michael)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Mortenson, Michael)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior, case number CIVSB2110363 Receipt No: ACACDC-31778361 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson) (Attorney Michael Donn Mortenson added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Mortenson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandra J. Williams et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Williams
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Joy DeLeon
Represented By: Joy Moiselle De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roscoe T. Williams
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Joy DeLeon
Represented By: Joy Moiselle De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Represented By: Craig A Taggart
Represented By: Patricia H Jun
Represented By: David M Keithly
Represented By: Patricia H. Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?