Patricia Reynoso et al v. Corona Post Acute, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Reynoso
Defendant: Corona Post Acute, LLC doing business as Corona Post Acute Center, Does 1-50 and Does 51-60
Case Number: 5:2021cv01376
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside Superior Court. (iv)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND #10 by Judge David O. Carter. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion. Accordingly, the Court REMANDS this case to the Superior Court of Riverside County, California. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #10 in Opposition to Motion filed by Defendant Corona Post Acute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-PREP Act Declaration, #3 Exhibit C-Amended Dec Invoking PREP Act, #4 Exhibit D-Second Amended Dec Invoking PREP Act, #5 Exhibit E-4th Amended HHS Dec, #6 Exhibit F-HHs Letter Prep Act 8.14.2020, #7 Exhibit G-HHS Advisory Opinion 10.22.2020, #8 Exhibit H-PREP Act Advisory Op by HHS 4.17.2020, #9 Exhibit I-PREP Act Covered Devices and Tests, #10 Exhibit J-CDC Jan 8. 2020, #11 Exhibit K-CDC Jan 17. 2020, #12 Exhibit L-CDC Jan 24, 2020, #13 Exhibit M-CDC Feb 1, 2020 Updated Guidance, #14 Exhibit N-CDPH AFLS Jan & Feb 2020, #15 Exhibit O-CMS Feb 6, 2020 Memo, #16 Exhibit P-CDC Feb 28, 2020 Updated Interim Guidance, #17 Exhibit Q-March 1 or 3, 2020 CDC Strategies, #18 Exhibit R-CDPH AFL March 3, 2020, #19 Exhibit S-CMS March 4, 2020 memo, #20 Exhibit T-CDC March 8, 2020 Updated Guidance, #21 Exhibit U-CDC March 10, 2020, #22 Exhibit V-CMS March 10, 2020 Memo, #23 Exhibit W-CDPH AFL 20-22 March 11, 2020, #24 Exhibit X-CMS March 13, 2020 Memo, #25 Exhibit Y-March 17, 2020 CDC Memos, #26 Exhibit Z-CMS March 20, 2020 QSO 20-20, #27 Exhibit AA-March 21, 2020 CDC Prep for Covid 19, #28 Exhibit BB-April 2, 2020 CMS Covid 19 LTCF Guidance, #29 Exhibit CC-5th Amended Dec under the PREP Act, #30 Exhibit DD-HHS Advisory Opinion 21-01 Jan 8, 2021, #31 Exhibit FF-Designation of Scarce Materials by HHS, #32 Exhibit GG-Rachal v. Natchitoches, #33 Exhibit HH-Umbrella EUA for surgical masks, #34 Exhibit II-Hand Sanitizer Final Guidance, #35 Exhibit JJ-Surveys)(Cruz, Kim)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Opposition opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Corona Post Acute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kim S. Cruz, #2 Exhibit KK to Declaration of Kim S. Cruz)(Cruz, Kim)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #11 , by Judge David O. Carter. (twdb)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 12/15/2021 re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant Corona Post Acute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cruz, Kim)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Patricia Reynoso. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order) (Smith, Dawn)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Corona Post Acute, LLC answer now due 9/20/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Corona Post Acute, LLC.(Cruz, Kim)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge David O. Carter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-01376-DOC (KKx). (et)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Corona Post Acute, LLC, Does 1-50, Does 51-60. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Patricia Reynoso. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/14/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE #4 . (et)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Corona Post Acute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ)(Canavan, Ryan)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Corona Post Acute, LLC, (Canavan, Ryan)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Corona Post Acute, LLC. (Canavan, Ryan)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number CVRI2103154 Receipt No: ACACDC-31813047 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Corona Post Acute, LLC. (Attorney Ryan G. Canavan added to party Corona Post Acute, LLC (pty:dft))(Canavan, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patricia Reynoso et al v. Corona Post Acute, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Reynoso
Represented By: Dawn Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corona Post Acute, LLC doing business as Corona Post Acute Center
Represented By: Ryan G. Canavan
Represented By: Evan J. Topol
Represented By: Kim Suzanne Cruz
Represented By: William C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 51-60
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?