Debbie Mendoza v. Princess House, Inc
Plaintiff: Debbie Mendoza
Defendant: Princess House, Inc and DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
3Rd Party Defendant: Libbey Glass LLC
Cross Defendant: Libby, Inc., Libby Glass, Inc. and ROES
Cross Claimant: Princess House, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv01491
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aubree Hudson Mackey counsel for Cross Defendant Libby, Inc.. Adding Aubree Mackey as counsel of record for Libbey Glass, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Cross-Defendant Libbey Glass, LLC. (Attorney Aubree Hudson Mackey added to party Libby, Inc.(pty:crd))(Mackey, Aubree)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court has reviewed the Response filed by Cross-Defendant Libbey Glass, LLC to the Court's Order to Show Cause #10 . The Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. (lc)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Response. Due to incorrect event, No Link to filer on docket entry, only shows attorneys name Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Cross Defendant Libby, Inc.. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Vahidi, Steven)
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 Response to Show Cause re: Amended Minutes, #8 (Vahidi, Steven)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for November 29, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS 17 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Defendant Libbey Glass LLC is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, by October 4, 2021, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to timely respond to this order will be construed as a concession that the Court lacks diversity jurisdiction and shall result in remand of the case, without further warning. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS). (lc)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Defendant Libbey Glass LLC is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, by October 4, 2021, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to timely respond to this order will be construed as a concession that the Court lacks diversity jurisdiction and shall result in remand of the case, without further warning. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS). (lc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:21-cv-01491 ODW(SHKx). (rn)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Cross Defendant Libby, Inc..(Vahidi, Steven)
September 1, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Debbie Mendoza in Riverside Superior Court on 3/15/2021, attached as Exhibit A1. (jtil)
September 1, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Princess House, Inc. in Riverside Superior Court on 5/14/2021, attached as Exhibit A2. (jtil)
September 1, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF CROSS COMPLAINT filed Princess House, Inc. in Riverside Superior Court on 5/14/2021, attached as Exhibit A3. (jtil)
September 1, 2021 NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Cross Complaint filed by Cross Defendant Libby, Inc., attached as Exhibit A4.(jtil)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Cross Defendant Libbey Glass LLC, (Vahidi, Steven)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by ThirdParty Defendant Libbey Glass LLC. (Vahidi, Steven)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County, case number CVR12101317 Receipt No: ACACDC-31913125 - Fee: $402, filed by Cross Defendant Libbey Glass LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exh A2 - Answer, #3 Exhibit Exh A3 - Cross Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exh A4 - Answer to Cross Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exh B - Consent to Removal) (Attorney Steven S Vahidi added to party Libbey Glass LLC(pty:3pd))(Vahidi, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debbie Mendoza v. Princess House, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Mendoza
Represented By: Aghavni V Kasparian
Represented By: Zareh Agob Jaltorossian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess House, Inc
Represented By: Susan K Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Libbey Glass LLC
Represented By: Steven S Vahidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Libby, Inc.
Represented By: Aubree Hudson Mackey
Represented By: Steven S Vahidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Libby Glass, Inc.
Represented By: Aubree Hudson Mackey
Represented By: Steven S Vahidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ROES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Princess House, Inc.
Represented By: Susan K Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?